EP4073690 - TARGET DETECTION METHOD, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 27.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Yi 2479 E Bayshore Rd, Suite 110 Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | Thorniley, Peter, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2022/42] | Application number, filing date | 20898883.2 | 08.09.2020 | [2022/42] | WO2020CN114064 | Priority number, date | US201962947314P | 12.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962947314 P | [2022/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021114777 | Date: | 17.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4073690 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/70, G06V10/82, G06T7/80, G06T7/579, G06V10/20, // G06V20/64, G06V20/58, G06T7/73, G06T7/77, G06V20/10 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
G06T7/73 (EP,US);
G06T7/579 (EP,US);
G06T7/70 (EP);
G06T7/77 (EP);
G06T7/80 (EP,US);
G06V10/255 (EP,US);
G06V10/26 (EP);
G06V10/454 (EP);
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
G06V10/82 (EP);
G06V20/10 (EP,US);
G06V20/64 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10016 (EP);
G06T2207/10028 (EP);
G06T2207/20072 (EP);
G06T2207/20076 (EP);
G06T2207/20081 (EP);
G06T2207/20084 (EP);
G06T2207/30201 (EP);
G06T2207/30208 (EP);
G06T2207/30244 (EP,US);
G06V2201/07 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/42] | G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Title | German: | ZIELERFASSUNGSVERFAHREN, ENDGERÄT, UND MEDIUM | [2022/42] | English: | TARGET DETECTION METHOD, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND MEDIUM | [2022/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE CIBLE, DISPOSITIF TERMINAL, ET SUPPORT | [2022/42] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 24.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN101202836 (SHENZHEN SKYWORTH RGB ELECT CO [CN]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * * abstract * * figure 3 *; | [Y]US2018012411 (RICHEY AARON LUKE [US], et al) [Y] 2,5-9,12,13 * the whole document * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0134] * * paragraph [0157] * * paragraphs [0173] - [0174] *; | [Y]WO2019092418 (HORIBA MIRA LTD [GB]) [Y] 10,11 * the whole document * * P30L5-28 *; | [IY]CN109784272 (NUPT INSTITUTE OF BIG DATA RES AT YANCHENG) [I] 1-7,14,15 * the whole document * * figures 1-4 * * summary * * technical field * [Y] 1-15; | [AP] - XIANG LI ET AL, "Object Detection in the Context of Mobile Augmented Reality", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20200815), XP081742155 [AP] 1-13 * the whole document * |