EP4072960 - CONTAINER CAP AND COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lyvecap LLC 5767 Greenback Lane Suite 200 Sacramento, CA 95841 / US | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIES, Yinka 5767 Greenback Lane Suite 200 Sacramento, CA 95841 / US | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | Secerna LLP The Old Fire Station 18 Clifford Street York YO1 9RD / GB | [2022/42] | Application number, filing date | 20900076.9 | 11.12.2020 | [2022/42] | WO2020US64628 | Priority number, date | US201916712504 | 12.12.2019 Original published format: US201916712504 | [2022/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021119502 | Date: | 17.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4072960 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B65D25/08, B65D41/14, B65D41/26, B65D41/56, B65D47/36, B65D81/32 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
B65D51/2835 (EP,KR);
B65D41/3428 (KR,US);
B65D41/62 (KR,US);
B65D47/121 (KR,US);
B65D81/3222 (KR);
B65D2401/20 (KR,US);
B65D2401/35 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Title | German: | BEHÄLTERKAPPE UND VERBINDUNGEN | [2022/42] | English: | CONTAINER CAP AND COMPOUNDS | [2022/42] | French: | BOUCHON DE RÉCIPIENT ET COMPOSÉS | [2022/42] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 28.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]KR20060008638 (CHO YOUNG KOOK [KR]); | [XAI]US2008093326 (CHO YOUNG KOOK [US]); | [XAI]WO2018167681 (STEERLIFE INDIA PRIVATE LTD [IN]) | International search | [A]US5246142 (DIPALMA ELIO [CA], et al) [A] 1-5, 23-26 * entire document *; | [A]US2004020797 (FONTANA ANTONIO [IT]) [A] 1-5,23-26 * entire document *; | [XY]US8215481 (KNICKERBOCKER MICHAEL G [US]) [X] 1,23,25,26 * entire document . * [Y] 2,3; | [Y]US2014305818 (LEE SEONG-JAE [KR]) [Y] 2,3 * entire document *; | [A]US9545607 (THOMPSON MARCIE [US]) [A] 1-5,23-26* entire document * |