EP4079070 - MEDIUM ACCESS CONTROL LAYER MAPPING FOR PATHLOSS REFERENCE SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 15.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHENG, Ruiming 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
ZHOU, Yan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
ZHANG, Yu 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
HE, Linhai 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
LUO, Tao 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6, D06 F9C7 / IE | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20900975.2 | 20.10.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020CN122100 | Priority number, date | WO2019CN126997 | 20.12.2019 Original published format: PCT/CN2019/126997 | [2022/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021120820 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4079070 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04B17/309, H04L5/00, H04W52/14, H04W52/24 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04L5/0048 (US);
H04L5/005 (EP);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04W52/146 (EP);
H04W52/242 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/43] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | MEDIENZUGRIFFSSTEUERSCHICHTABBILDUNG FÜR WEGVERLUSTREFERENZSIGNAL | [2022/43] | English: | MEDIUM ACCESS CONTROL LAYER MAPPING FOR PATHLOSS REFERENCE SIGNAL | [2022/43] | French: | MAPPAGE DE COUCHE DE CONTRÔLE D'ACCÈS AU SUPPORT POUR SIGNAL DE RÉFÉRENCE AVEC AFFAIBLISSEMENT LE LONG DU TRAJET | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 12.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |