EP4080357 - VIRTUAL MACHINE NUMA NODE SCHEDULING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND DEVICE AND MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 22.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sangfor Technologies Inc. Block A1, Nanshan Ipark No.1001 Xueyuan Road Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518055 / CN | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Fei Block A1, Nanshan IPark No.1001 Xueyuan Road, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518055 / CN | 02 /
ZHOU, Xu Block A1, Nanshan IPark No.1001 Xueyuan Road, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518055 / CN | 03 /
LIN, Zhanglong Block A1, Nanshan IPark No.1001 Xueyuan Road, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518055 / CN | 04 /
CHEN, Lie Block A1, Nanshan IPark No.1001 Xueyuan Road, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518055 / CN | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB (Muc) Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/43] | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20901953.8 | 10.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020CN135170 | Priority number, date | CN201911312243 | 18.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911312243 | [2022/43] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021121115 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4080357 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/455, G06F9/50 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
G06F9/45558 (EP,CN);
G06F9/5038 (CN);
G06F9/505 (CN);
G06F9/5077 (EP);
G06F9/5083 (EP,CN);
G06F2009/4557 (EP,CN);
G06F2209/5021 (CN)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/43] | G06F9/455 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | NUMA-KNOTENPLANUNGSVERFAHREN UND -GERÄT FÜR VIRTUELLE MASCHINE, UND VORRICHTUNG UND MEDIUM | [2022/43] | English: | VIRTUAL MACHINE NUMA NODE SCHEDULING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND DEVICE AND MEDIUM | [2022/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE PLANIFICATION DE NOEUD NUMA DE MACHINE VIRTUELLE, AINSI QUE DISPOSITIF ET SUPPORT | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2022 | Translation filed | 14.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 21.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - ALI QASIM ET AL, "Power Aware NUMA Scheduler in VMware's ESXi Hypervisor", 2015 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON WORKLOAD CHARACTERIZATION, IEEE, (20151004), doi:10.1109/IISWC.2015.30, pages 193 - 202, XP032804837 [I] 1-14 * page 193 - page 197 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IISWC.2015.30 | [A] - V M Ware, "Resource Management Guide", (20081114), URL: https://www.aberdeeninc.com/abcatg/docs-vmware/vi3_35_25_u2_resource_mgmt.pdf, (20171207), XP055433104 [A] 5 * page 154 * | [A] - WU SONG ET AL, "vProbe: Scheduling Virtual Machines on NUMA Systems", 2016 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CLUSTER COMPUTING (CLUSTER), IEEE, (20160912), doi:10.1109/CLUSTER.2016.60, pages 70 - 79, XP033018860 [A] 5 * page 73 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CLUSTER.2016.60 | [A] - TIMOTHY WOOD ET AL, "Black-box and Gray-box Strategies for Virtual Machine Migration", USENIX, USENIX, THE ADVANCED COMPUTING SYSTEMS ASSOCIATION, (20070411), pages 1 - 14, XP061009190 [A] 6 * page 237 * | [A] - Vmware, "Performance Best Practices for VMware vSphere 5.1", (20121021), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20121021054231/http://www.vmware.com/pdf/Perf_Best_Practices_vSphere5.1.pdf, (20160512), XP055272218 [A] 1-14 * pages 19,21,42 * |