EP4064683 - CONTROL METHOD, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM, AND CHIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honor Device Co., Ltd. Suite 3401, Unit A, Building 6 Shum Yip Sky Park, No. 8089 Hongli West Road Xiangmihu Street, Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIANG, Dongsheng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | 02 /
DU, Mingliang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/39] | Application number, filing date | 20902272.2 | 16.12.2020 | [2022/39] | WO2020CN136645 | Priority number, date | CN201911310883 | 18.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911310883 | [2022/39] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021121236 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4064683 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N23/661, H04N23/667, H04N23/80, H04N23/90 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
H04N23/661 (EP,US);
H04N23/90 (EP,CN,US);
H04N23/667 (EP);
H04N23/80 (EP,US);
H04N23/95 (CN);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/39] | H04N5/232, H04N5/247 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Title | German: | STEUERVERFAHREN, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG, COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM UND CHIP | [2022/39] | English: | CONTROL METHOD, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM, AND CHIP | [2022/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE, SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR ET PUCE | [2022/39] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2022 | Translation filed | 23.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 17.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006280496 (TANOUE YASUYUKI [JP]) [X] 1-7,9-11,14,15 * paragraphs [0029] , [0059] , [0063] - [0071] - [0091] - [0096] - [ 117]; figures 5,6 * [I] 8,12,13; | [A]CN103841322 (YULONG COMP TELECOMM SCIENT) [A] 6* figures 2,3 *; | [A]US2016014322 (KIMURA MASAHIKO [JP]) [A] 2 * paragraphs [0066] - [0069]; figures 4A, 4B *; | [XI]US2017201672 (HAYASHI DAISUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,14,15 * paragraphs [0065] - [0066] - [0095] , [ 104] - [0122]; figure 9 * [I] 12,13 |