EP4077827 - ILLUMINATED ACOUSTIC CEILING ELEMENT AND ILLUMINATED ACOUSTIC CEILING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Certainteed Canada, Inc. 61 Royal Group Crescent Woodbridge ON L4H 1X9 / CA | For:PL
Briggs, Timothy 136 Water St. 1 Clinton, MA 01510 / US | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARTELLA, Luigi 158 Cocksfield Ave. Toronto, ON M3H 3T5 / CA | 02 /
BRIGGS, Timothy 136 Water St. 1 Clinton, MA 01510 / US | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20902439.7 | 18.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020US66122 | Priority number, date | US201962949659P | 18.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962949659 P | [2022/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021127506 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4077827 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E04B9/00, F21V33/00, F21V21/04, F21V21/008, F21V7/04, F21Y115/10 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
E04B9/006 (EP);
F21S8/026 (US);
E04B9/001 (EP,US);
E04B9/225 (EP);
F21S8/061 (EP);
F21V33/0056 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | BELEUCHTETES AKUSTISCHES DECKENELEMENT UND BELEUCHTETES AKUSTISCHES DECKENSYSTEM | [2022/43] | English: | ILLUMINATED ACOUSTIC CEILING ELEMENT AND ILLUMINATED ACOUSTIC CEILING SYSTEM | [2022/43] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE PLAFOND ACOUSTIQUE ÉCLAIRÉ ET SYSTÈME DE PLAFOND ACOUSTIQUE ÉCLAIRÉ | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 15.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 05.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2019017260 (BOU HARB JOSEPH [US], et al) [Y] 1-15* paragraph [0048]; figure 1 *; | [IY]WO2019192950 (SIGNIFY HOLDING BV [NL]) [I] 1-15 * page 6, line 20 - page 12, line 20; figure 1 * [Y] 1-15 | International search | [A]JPH0589630U (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD.) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0006]-[0009]; and figures 1-4 *; | [Y]DE202010003644U (MAIER ADOLF [DE]) [Y] 11-12 * paragraph [0035]; and figure 4 *; | [A]WO2013190447 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-19 * page 19, line 18 - page 20, line 3; and figures 2a-2c *; | [Y]US2015109765 (SEPKHANOV RUSLAN AKHMEDOVICH [NL], et al) [Y] 11-12; | [A]CN207332073U (SHENZHEN CLOCELL ACOUSTICS TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-19* paragraphs [0034]-[0053]; and figures 1-14 * |