EP4076076 - FILTER MEDIA COMPRISING A NON-WETLAID BACKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2023 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hollingsworth & Vose Company 112 Washington Street East Walpole, MA 02032 / US | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEALEY, David T. 89 High Ridge Road Bellingham, MA 02019 / US | 02 /
SMITH, Bruce 7251 Floyd Highway North Copper Hill, VA 24079 / US | 03 /
LEARY, Jennifer Dana 680 Christiansburg Pike Road N.E. Floyd, VA 24091 / US | 04 /
FARELL, Greg Wagner 8232 River Course Drive Radford, VA 24141 / US | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20902866.1 | 17.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020US65610 | Priority number, date | US201916721788 | 19.12.2019 Original published format: US201916721788 | [2022/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021127177 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4076076 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A41D13/11, B01D39/16, B01D46/00 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
B01D39/163 (EP,US);
B32B3/00 (EP);
B32B5/022 (EP);
B32B5/028 (EP);
B32B5/08 (EP);
B32B5/26 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP);
D04H1/435 (EP,US);
D04H1/4374 (EP,US);
D04H1/43825 (EP);
D04H1/43835 (EP);
D04H1/43918 (EP,US);
D04H1/56 (EP);
D04H1/58 (EP,US);
D04H1/728 (EP);
D04H1/732 (US);
B01D2239/0435 (EP);
B01D2239/0442 (EP);
B01D2239/0457 (EP);
B01D2239/0618 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0622 (EP);
B01D2239/0631 (EP);
B01D2239/0681 (EP,US);
B01D2239/083 (EP);
B01D2239/1233 (EP,US);
B32B2250/02 (EP);
B32B2250/03 (EP);
B32B2250/04 (EP);
B32B2250/05 (EP);
B32B2250/20 (EP);
B32B2260/021 (EP);
B32B2260/046 (EP);
B32B2262/02 (EP);
B32B2262/0215 (EP);
B32B2262/0223 (EP);
B32B2262/0238 (EP);
B32B2262/0246 (EP);
B32B2262/0253 (EP);
B32B2262/0261 (EP);
B32B2262/0269 (EP);
B32B2262/0276 (EP);
B32B2262/0292 (EP);
B32B2262/04 (EP);
B32B2262/062 (EP);
B32B2262/065 (EP);
B32B2262/103 (EP);
B32B2262/106 (EP);
B32B2262/12 (EP);
B32B2262/14 (EP);
B32B2307/3065 (EP);
B32B2307/54 (EP);
B32B2307/554 (EP);
B32B2307/718 (EP);
B32B2307/72 (EP);
B32B2307/724 (EP);
B32B2307/7244 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
B32B2457/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FILTERMEDIUM MIT NICHT-NASSVLIES-TRÄGER | [2022/43] | English: | FILTER MEDIA COMPRISING A NON-WETLAID BACKER | [2022/43] | French: | MILIEUX FILTRANTS COMPRENANT UN ENVERS NON HUMIDE | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 07.02.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.01.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004147215 (NYSTROM BERNT [SE]) [A] 1-2,4* , abstract; para [0020] *; | [A]US2012160104 (VULFSON YURI [US]) [A] 1, 3-4 * , paras [0013], [0047], [0055] *; | [A]US2017304755 (BANSAL VISHAL [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * , abstract; FIGS. 1-2; paras [0005], [0033], [0035], [0037] *; | [A]US2018001247 (JINKA SUDHEER [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * , abstract; FIGS. 1, 5; paras [0023], [0042], [0074]. [0108], [0111], [0117] * |