EP4064780 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PERIODICALLY TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING DATA IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Sungjin 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
OH, Jinyoung 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
BANG, Jonghyun 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
SHIN, Cheolkyu 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2022/39] | Application number, filing date | 20902931.3 | 21.12.2020 | [2022/39] | WO2020KR18730 | Priority number, date | KR20190172309 | 20.12.2019 Original published format: KR 20190172309 | KR20200135286 | 19.10.2020 Original published format: KR 20200135286 | KR20200153950 | 17.11.2020 Original published format: KR 20200153950 | [2022/39] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021125907 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4064780 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12, H04L1/18, H04L5/00, H04L1/1867 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04L1/1812 (US);
H04L1/1854 (EP);
H04L1/1861 (EP);
H04L1/1864 (EP);
H04L1/1896 (EP);
H04L5/0055 (EP);
H04L5/14 (US);
H04W72/21 (US);
H04L5/0007 (EP);
H04L5/001 (EP);
H04L5/0016 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/39] | H04W72/12, H04L1/18, H04L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM PERIODISCHEN SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN VON DATEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2022/39] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PERIODICALLY TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING DATA IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2022/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE TRANSMETTRE ET DE RECEVOIR RÉGULIÈREMENT DES DONNÉES DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2022/39] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2022 | Translation filed | 20.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 22.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - WILUS INC, "Remaining Issues on SPS PDSCH for NR URLLC", vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, USA; 20191118 - 20191122, (20191109), pages 1 - 5, 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1913071, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_99/Docs/R1-1913071.zip R1-1913071_SPS_final.docx, (20191109), XP051823764 [X] 1-15 * page 4 - page 5 * * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 3 * | [X] - NOKIA ET AL, "On resource conflicts between UL grants and HARQ-ACK Enhancements for SPS", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, CZ; 20190826 - 20190830, (20190816), pages 1 - 9, 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1908439_NOKIA_NR_URLLC_SPS_AND_PUSCH_CONFLICTS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_98/Docs/R1-1908439.zip, (20190816), XP051765048 [X] 1-15 * paragraph [03.1] * | [X] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Discussion on DL SPS enhancement and resource conflict between PUSCHs", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20190826 - 20190830, (20190817), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1908547 URLLC SPS DGCG V2, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_98/Docs/R1-1908547.zip, (20190817), XP051765155 [X] 1-15 * paragraph [02.2] * | International search | [A]KR20130115348 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0134]-[0242]. *; | [Y] - NTT DOCOMO, INC, "Discussions on DL SPS enhancement", 3GPP Draft; R1-1912891, Reno, USA, (20191109), vol. RAN WG1, pages 1 - 9, XP051823670 [Y] 1-15 * See sections 3-4; and figure 9. * | [Y] - WILUS Inc, "Remaining Issues on SPS PDSCH for NR URLLC", 3GPP Draft; R1-1913071, Reno, USA, (20191109), vol. RAN WG1, pages 1 - 5, XP051823764 [Y] 1-15 * See section 2; and figure 1. * | [A] - Motorola Mobility, Lenovo, "HARQ-ACK feedback for enhanced DL SPS", 3GPP Draft; R1-1912854, Reno, USA, (20191109), vol. RAN WG1, pages 1 - 4, XP051823652 [A] 1-15 * See section 2. * | [A] - Institute for Information Industry (III), "Enhancements to DL SPS", 3GPP Draft; R1-1912778, Reno, USA, (20191108), vol. RAN WG1, pages 1 - 5, XP051820196 [A] 1-15 * See sections 2-4. * | by applicant | - 3GPP standard TS38.213 | - 3GPP standard TS 38.213 |