EP4068790 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING VIDEO PLAYBACK, TERMINAL DEVICE, SERVER, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Petal Cloud Technology Co., Ltd. Room 101, Building 4, No. 15 Huanhu Road Songshan Lake Campus Dongguan, Guangdong 523799 / CN | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAN, Wei Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/40] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20903322.4 | 30.10.2020 | [2022/40] | WO2020CN125517 | Priority number, date | CN201911317023 | 19.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911317023 | [2022/40] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021120892 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4068790 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/2662 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
H04N21/6547 (EP);
H04N21/4126 (CN,US);
H04N21/2662 (CN,US);
H04N21/26208 (CN);
H04N21/26216 (CN);
H04N21/4331 (CN,US);
H04N21/438 (CN);
H04N21/44209 (EP,US);
H04N21/4425 (EP);
H04N21/4621 (EP);
H04N21/658 (CN);
H04N21/6582 (EP);
H04N21/8456 (CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN EINER VIDEOWIEDERGABE, ENDGERÄT, SERVER UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/40] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING VIDEO PLAYBACK, TERMINAL DEVICE, SERVER, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE LECTURE VIDÉO, DISPOSITIF TERMINAL, SERVEUR ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2022 | Translation filed | 29.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 20.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009216897 (WANG ZHIMIN [CN]) [X] 1,10-14 * paragraphs [0036] - [0047]; figure -; claim - * [I] 2-9; | [A]US2017155932 (FU DELIANG [CN], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraphs [0018] - [0040]; figure -; claim - * |