EP4062632 - METHOD AND APPARATUS OF CONSTRAINED LAYER-WISE VIDEO CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HFI Innovation Inc. 3F.-7, No.5, Taiyuan 1st Street Zhubei City, Hsinchu County 302 / TW | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUANG, Tzu-Der No. 1, Dusing 1st Rd., Hsinchu Science Park Hsinchu City, Taiwan 30078 / TW | 02 /
HSU, Chih-Wei No. 1, Dusing 1st Rd., Hsinchu Science Park Hsinchu City, Taiwan 30078 / TW | 03 /
CHEN, Ching-Yeh No. 1, Dusing 1st Rd., Hsinchu Science Park Hsinchu City, Taiwan 30078 / TW | 04 /
CHEN, Lulin 2840 Junction Ave San Jose, California 95134 / US | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Patentship Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Paul-Gerhardt-Allee 50 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/39] | Patentship Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elsenheimerstraße 65 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20903613.6 | 17.12.2020 | [2022/39] | WO2020CN137176 | Priority number, date | US201962948971P | 17.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962948971 P | US201962954019P | 27.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962954019 P | US202017121927 | 15.12.2020 Original published format: US202017121927 | [2022/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021121313 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4062632 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/186, H04N19/30, H04N19/70, H04N19/51 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
H04N19/70 (EP,KR);
H04N19/30 (EP,KR);
H04N19/105 (KR,US);
H04N19/159 (KR,US);
H04N19/186 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/187 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/39] | H04N7/00, H04N21/435 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESCHRÄNKTEN SCHICHTWEISEN VIDEOCODIERUNG | [2022/39] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS OF CONSTRAINED LAYER-WISE VIDEO CODING | [2022/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE CODAGE VIDÉO PAR COUCHES CONTRAINT | [2022/39] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 22.02.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2014218473 (HANNUKSELA MISKA MATIAS [FI], et al) [X] 1,4 * paragraph [0483] - paragraph [0485] * [Y] 2,3; | [Y]US2017195680 (YAMAMOTO TOMOYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0261] *; | [XY] - BENJAMIN BROSS ET AL, "Versatile Video Coding (Draft 7)", no. JVET-P2001-vE; JVET-P2001 ; m51515, (20191114), pages 1 - 489, 16. JVET MEETING; 20191001 - 20191011; GENEVA; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/16_Geneva/wg11/JVET-P2001-v14.zip JVET-P2001-vE.docx, (20191114), XP030224330 [X] 5-8 * section 6.2 * * section 7.4.3.2 * * page 97 - page 98 * * page 268 - page 269 * * page 415 * [Y] 2,3,9 | [XP] - T-D CHUANG ET AL, "AHG9: Chroma format and bitdepth constraint for multi-layer structure", no. JVET-Q0172 ; m51761, (20191230), 17. JVET MEETING; 20200107 - 20200117; BRUSSELS; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/17_Brussels/wg11/JVET-Q0172-v1.zip JVET-Q0172-v1.docx, (20191230), XP030222778 [XP] 1-9 * sections 2 and 3 * | [A] - GAO Y ET AL, "Bit depth scalability", 22. JVT MEETING; 79. MPEG MEETING; 13-01-2007 - 20-01-2007; MARRAKECH,MA; (JOINT VIDEO TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, (20070119), no. JVT-V061, XP030006869 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * |