EP4082470 - BONE REGISTRATION METHOD, SURGICAL ROBOT, AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microport Navibot (Suzhou) Co., Ltd. Plant 3, No. 151 Fengli Street, SIP Suzhou, Jiangsu 215000 / CN | [2022/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PENG, Weili Plant 3, No. 151 Fengli Street, SIP Suzhou, Jiangsu 215000 / CN | 02 /
JIANG, Zhou Plant 3, No. 151 Fengli Street, SIP Suzhou, Jiangsu 215000 / CN | 03 /
SUN, Feng Plant 3, No. 151 Fengli Street, SIP Suzhou, Jiangsu 215000 / CN | 04 /
HE, Chao Plant 3, No. 151 Fengli Street, SIP Suzhou, Jiangsu 215000 / CN | 05 /
LI, Tao Plant 3, No. 151 Fengli Street, SIP Suzhou, Jiangsu 215000 / CN | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Patentship Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Paul-Gerhardt-Allee 50 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/44] | Patentship Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elsenheimerstraße 65 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20905068.1 | 11.06.2020 | [2022/44] | WO2020CN95666 | Priority number, date | CN201911368137 | 26.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911368137 | [2022/44] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021128755 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4082470 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/30, A61B34/00 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
A61B34/30 (EP,CN);
A61B34/20 (US);
A61B34/10 (US);
A61B34/25 (CN);
A61B34/37 (US);
A61B34/76 (CN);
G06T7/344 (US);
A61B2017/00725 (EP);
A61B2034/105 (EP,US);
A61B2034/107 (US);
A61B2034/2055 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2059 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2061 (EP);
A61B2034/2068 (EP);
A61B2034/207 (US);
A61B2090/064 (EP);
A61B2090/3983 (EP);
G06N3/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] | Title | German: | KNOCHENREGISTRIERUNGSVERFAHREN, CHIRURGISCHER ROBOTER UND LESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/44] | English: | BONE REGISTRATION METHOD, SURGICAL ROBOT, AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ALIGNEMENT OSSEUX, ROBOT CHIRURGICAL ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE | [2022/44] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2021 | Translation filed | 29.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 16.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.02.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2018263714 (KOSTRZEWSKI SZYMON [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,8-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0023] , [0 24] , [ 129] - [0135] * [A] 5,12-15 [I] 4,6,7,11; | [A]US2019053862 (ECKE KAROLIN [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0066] - [0068] *; | [A]US2019090966 (KANG HYOSIG [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0051] - [0055] * | International search | [A]CN104626168 (UNIV SOOCHOW) [A] 12-25 * entire document *; | [A]US2017277285 (CHUNG CHING-LIN [TW], et al) [A] 12-25* entire document *; | [A]CN109443207 (UNIV HUAZHONG SCIENCE TECH, et al) [A] 12-25 * entire document *; | [A]CN109500837 (SHANGHAI LINGXIAN ROBOTICS TECH CO LTD) [A] 12-25 * entire document *; | [Y]CN110103217 (UNIV ELECTRONIC SCI & TECH CHINA) [Y] 12-25 * description, paragraphs [0002]-[0048], and figures 1-3 *; | [Y]CN110394801 (QIANYUAN YUNLI BEIJING ROBOT INTELLIGENT TECH CO LTD) [Y] 18-22 * description, paragraphs [0004]-[0130], and figures 1-5 *; | [Y]CN110547873 (BEIJING AKEC MEDICAL CO LTD) [Y] 12-25 * description, paragraphs [0002]-[0040], and figures 1 and 2 *; | [PX]CN111035454 (SUZHOU WEICHUANG CHANGXING ROBOT CO LTD) [PX] 12-25 * description, paragraphs [0002]-[0151], and figures 1-13 * |