EP4088739 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING ERIBULIN-BASED ANTIBODY-DRUG CONJUGATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eisai R&D Management Co., Ltd. 4-6-10 Koishikawa Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8088 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/46] | For all designated states Eisai R&D Management Co., Ltd. 4-6-10 Koishikawa Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8088 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUO Kimihiro C/O Eisai Co., Ltd. Kashima Plant, 22, Sunayama Kamisu-shi, Ibaraki 314-0255 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA Taiju C/O Eisai Co., Ltd. Kashima Plant, 22, Sunayama Kamisu-shi, Ibaraki 314-0255 / JP | 03 /
MIYASHITA Yusuke C/O Eisai Co., Ltd. Kashima Plant, 22, Sunayama Kamisu-shi, Ibaraki 314-0255 / JP | [2022/46] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/46] | Application number, filing date | 20905452.7 | 21.12.2020 | [2022/46] | WO2020JP47706 | Priority number, date | JP20190231938 | 23.12.2019 Original published format: JP 2019231938 | [2022/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021132166 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4088739 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61P35/00, C07K5/062, C07K16/28, A61K47/68, C12N15/13, A61K31/357 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K31/357 (IL,KR);
A61K47/6803 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/6849 (US);
A61K39/395 (IL);
A61K47/545 (US);
A61K47/68 (IL);
A61K47/6889 (EP);
C07K16/00 (IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] | Extension states | BA | 30.06.2022 | ME | 30.06.2022 | Validation states | KH | 30.06.2022 | MA | 30.06.2022 | MD | 30.06.2022 | TN | 30.06.2022 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM PRODUZIEREN EINES ERIBULINBASIERTEN ANTIKÖRPER-WIRKSTOFFKONJUGATS | [2022/46] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING ERIBULIN-BASED ANTIBODY-DRUG CONJUGATE | [2022/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN CONJUGUÉ ANTICORPS-MÉDICAMENT À BASE D'ÉRIBULINE | [2022/46] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2022 | Translation filed | 30.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 14.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO03062375 (GENENTECH INC [US]) [Y] 2-5* fig. 1A, 1B *; | [XY]WO2013072813 (PFIZER [US]) [X] 8 * pp. 79-80, page 108, lines 11-23, page 111, lines 29-30 pp. 79-80, page 108, lines 11-23, page 111, lines 29-30 * [Y] 1-7; | [Y]WO2014205342 (MORPHOTEK INC [US]) [Y] 2-5 * paragraph [0081] SEQ ID NO: 41, 46, paragraph [0089] SEQ ID NO: 7, 8 *; | [XY]WO2016151432 (PFIZER [US]) [X] 8 * p. 97 p. 97 * [Y] 1-7; | [Y]WO2017151979 (EISAI INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * claims, paragraph [0013] *; | [XY]WO2018200812 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 8 * page 556, examples 1-5 page 556, examples 1-5 * [Y] 1-7; | [XY]WO2019232449 (EISAI R&D MAN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 8 * paragraph [1010] paragraph [1010] * [Y] 1-7; | [XY] - Cazzamalli Samuele, Figueras Eduard, Pethő Lilla, Borbély Adina, Steinkühler Christian, Neri Dario, Sewald Norbert, "In Vivo Antitumor Activity of a Novel Acetazolamide-Cryptophycin Conjugate for the Treatment of Renal Cell Carcinomas", ACS Omega, (20181102), vol. 3, no. 11, ISSN 2470-1343, pages 14726 - 14731, XP055838198 [X] 8 * , page 14727, scheme 1 page 14727, scheme 1 page 14727, scheme 1 * [Y] 1-7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acsomega.8b02350 | by applicant | US4816567 | WO9005144 | US5821337 | WO2006034488 | WO2017151979 | - MUKHTAR et al., Mol. Cancer Ther., (20140000), vol. 13, pages 275 - 84 | - DUMONTETJORDAN, Nat. Rev. Drug Discov., (20100000), vol. 9, pages 790 - 803 | - O'SHANNESSY et al., Int. J. Gynecol. Pathol., (20130000), vol. 32, no. 3, pages 258 - 68 | - CHRISTOPH et al., Clin. Lung Cancer, (20140000), vol. 15, no. 5, pages 320 - 30 | - KING et al., Science, (19850000), vol. 229, pages 974 - 6 | - SLAMON et al., Science, (19890000), vol. 244, pages 707 - 12 | - GAJRIACHANDARLAPATY, Expert Rev. Anticancer Ther., (20110000), vol. 11, pages 263 - 75 | - O' SHANNESSY et al., Oncotarget, (20110000), vol. 2, pages 1227 - 43 | - FENGDOOLITTLE, J. Mol. Evol., (19870000), vol. 35, pages 351 - 60 | - KOHLER et al., Nature, (19750000), vol. 256, page 495 | - CLACKSON et al., Nature, (19910000), vol. 352, pages 624 - 8 | - MARKS et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19910000), vol. 222, pages 581 - 97 | - WARD et al., Nature, (19890000), vol. 341, pages 544 - 6 | - BIRD et al., Science, (19880000), vol. 242, pages 423 - 6 | - HUSTON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19880000), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 83 | - HE et al., J. Nucl. Med., (20100000), vol. 51, pages 427 - 32 | - FITTING et al., MAbs, (20150000), vol. 7, pages 390 - 402 | - HOLLIGER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 87 | - POLJAK et al., Structure, (19940000), vol. 2, pages 1121 - 3 | - "NCBI", Database accession no. NP 004439.2 | - HAGER-BRAUNTOMER, Expert Rev. Proteomics, (20050000), vol. 2, pages 745 - 56 | - PEARSON, LIPMAN, Proc. Nat. Acad. Sci. USA, (19880000), vol. 85, page 2444 | - TZARTOS, Methods in Molecular Biology, (19980000), vol. 66, pages 55 - 66 | - EBEL et al., Cancer Immunity, (20070000), vol. 7, page 6 | - LYON et al., Methods Enzymol., (20120000), vol. 502, pages 123 - 38 | - DUBOWCHIK et al., Bioconjugate Chem, (20020000), vol. 13, pages 855 - 69 | - JAIN et al., Pharm. Res., (20150000), vol. 32, pages 3526 - 40 | - SIMON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19920000), vol. 89, page 9367 | - SMITHWATERMAN, Adv. Appl. Math., (19810000), vol. 2, page 482 | - NEEDLEMAN, WUNSCH, J. Mol. Biol., (19700000), vol. 48, page 443 | - DEVEREUX et al., Nucl. Acid Res., (19840000), vol. 12, pages 387 - 95 | - "Current Methods in Sequence Comparison and Analysis", Macromolecule Sequencing and Synthesis, Selected Methods and Applications, Alan R. Liss, Inc, (19880000), pages 127 - 149 | - HIGGINSSHARP, CABIOS, (19890000), vol. 5, pages 151 - 3 | - ALTSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 10 | - ALTSCHUL et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19970000), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 402 | - ALTSCHUL et al., Methods in Enzymology, (19960000), vol. 266, pages 460 - 80 | - ALTSCHUL et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19930000), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 402 |