EP4083295 - SPUN-BONDED NONWOVEN FABRIC, FILTER LAMINATE FILTER MATERIAL, FILTER MATERIAL FOR DUST COLLECTOR PLEATED FILTER, DUST COLLECTOR PLEATED FILTER, AND MEDIUM-AIR-VOLUME PULSE-JET TYPE DUST COLLECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-muromachi, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/44] | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-muromachi, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo, 103-8666 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEJIRI, Yuki c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIDA, Jun c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 03 /
KITAMURA, Koji c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-8558 / JP | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/44] | Application number, filing date | 20905463.4 | 23.12.2020 | [2022/44] | WO2020JP48302 | Priority number, date | JP20190232127 | 23.12.2019 Original published format: JP 2019232127 | [2022/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021132402 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4083295 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | D04H3/147, B01D39/16, D04H3/011 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
D04H3/147 (EP,KR,US);
B01D39/163 (EP,US);
B01D39/1623 (KR);
B01D39/1692 (EP);
B01D46/521 (EP,KR,US);
B01D46/543 (US);
B01D46/71 (EP,US);
B01D63/14 (EP);
B01D67/00042 (EP);
B01D69/02 (EP);
B01D69/1071 (EP);
B01D69/1213 (EP);
B01D71/36 (KR);
B32B27/12 (US);
B32B27/322 (US);
B32B5/022 (US);
D04H3/011 (EP,US);
D04H3/16 (US);
B01D2239/0216 (US);
B01D2239/0233 (EP);
B01D2239/0407 (EP);
B01D2239/0421 (EP);
B01D2239/0442 (EP);
B01D2239/0618 (KR,US);
B01D2239/0627 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2239/065 (US);
B01D2239/0654 (EP);
B01D2239/0668 (EP,KR);
B01D2239/069 (EP);
B01D2239/10 (EP);
B01D2239/1233 (EP,US);
B01D2239/1258 (EP,US);
B01D2239/1291 (EP,US);
B01D2323/39 (EP);
B01D2325/20 (EP);
B01D2325/24 (EP);
B32B2250/02 (US);
B32B2262/0284 (US);
B32B2262/124 (US);
B32B2262/16 (US);
B32B2307/546 (US);
B32B2307/718 (US);
B32B2307/724 (US);
B32B2307/73 (US);
D10B2505/04 (KR,US);
Y02A50/2351 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/44] | D04H3/147, B01D39/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] | Title | German: | SPINNVLIESSTOFF, FILTERLAMINATFILTERMATERIAL, FILTERMATERIAL FÜR FALTENFILTER EINES STAUBABSCHEIDERS, FALTENFILTER FÜR STAUBABSCHEIDER UND STAUBSAMMLER VOM PULS-JET-TYP MIT MITTLEREM LUFTVOLUMEN | [2022/44] | English: | SPUN-BONDED NONWOVEN FABRIC, FILTER LAMINATE FILTER MATERIAL, FILTER MATERIAL FOR DUST COLLECTOR PLEATED FILTER, DUST COLLECTOR PLEATED FILTER, AND MEDIUM-AIR-VOLUME PULSE-JET TYPE DUST COLLECTOR | [2022/44] | French: | NON-TISSÉ FILÉ-LIÉ, MATÉRIAU FILTRANT À STRATIFIÉ DE FILTRE, MATÉRIAU FILTRANT POUR FILTRE PLISSÉ DE COLLECTEUR DE POUSSIÈRE, FILTRE PLISSÉ DE COLLECTEUR DE POUSSIÈRE ET COLLECTEUR DE POUSSIÈRE DE TYPE À JET D'IMPULSION À VOLUME D'AIR MOYEN | [2022/44] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2022 | Translation filed | 30.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 25.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH09192426 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-8* paragraphs [0026] , [0028] *; | [A]JP2017127832 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0077] , [0079]; examples 1-2 * * table 1 * | International search | [A]JPH09192426 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-8* example 1 *; | [A]WO9737071 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * example 1-(9) * | by applicant | JPS5422874B | JP4522671B | JP5298803B |