EP4083700 - PULSE SHAPING DEVICE AND PULSE SHAPING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 17.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Institutes for Quantum Science and Technology 4-9-1, Anagawa Inage-ku Chiba-shi Chiba 263-8555 / JP | [2022/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIKINO, Masaharu c/o NATIONAL INSTITUTES FOR QUANTUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, 4-9-1, Anagawa, Inage-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 263-8555 / JP | 02 /
MORI, Michiaki c/o NATIONAL INSTITUTES FOR QUANTUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, 4-9-1, Anagawa, Inage-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 263-8555 / JP | 03 /
DINH, Thanhhung c/o NATIONAL INSTITUTES FOR QUANTUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, 4-9-1, Anagawa, Inage-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 263-8555 / JP | 04 /
KOJIMA, Sadaoki c/o NATIONAL INSTITUTES FOR QUANTUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, 4-9-1, Anagawa, Inage-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 263-8555 / JP | 05 /
KITAMURA, Toshiyuki c/o NATIONAL INSTITUTES FOR QUANTUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, 4-9-1, Anagawa, Inage-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 263-8555 / JP | 06 /
HASEGAWA, Noboru c/o NATIONAL INSTITUTES FOR QUANTUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, 4-9-1, Anagawa, Inage-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 263-8555 / JP | 07 /
KONDO, Kiminori c/o NATIONAL INSTITUTES FOR QUANTUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, 4-9-1, Anagawa, Inage-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 263-8555 / JP | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/44] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 20907172.9 | 27.11.2020 | [2022/44] | WO2020JP44173 | Priority number, date | JP20190239404 | 27.12.2019 Original published format: JP 2019239404 | [2022/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021131487 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4083700 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/00, G02F1/35 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
H01S3/0057 (EP,US);
G02F1/3503 (EP);
G02F1/3511 (EP);
G02F1/3551 (US);
H01S3/0092 (US);
H01S3/10023 (US);
H01S3/10061 (US);
H01S3/1636 (US);
H01S2301/02 (EP);
H01S3/005 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/44] | G02F1/35, H01S3/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR IMPULSFORMUNG | [2022/44] | English: | PULSE SHAPING DEVICE AND PULSE SHAPING METHOD | [2022/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN FORME D'IMPULSION ET PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN FORME D'IMPULSION | [2022/44] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2022 | Translation filed | 06.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 17.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2006170858 (ALBERT OLIVIER [FR], et al) [I] 1,10 * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0031] *; | [XYI]US2015010027 (SIMON-BOISSON CHRISTOPHE [FR]) [X] 1,9-11 * paragraphs [0029] - [0057]; figure 2 * [Y] 3-7 [I] 2,8; | [Y] - JULLIEN A ET AL, "Highly efficient temporal cleaner for femtosecond pulses based on cross-polarized wave generation in a dual crystal scheme", APPLIED PHYSICS B ; LASERS AND OPTICS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20060629), vol. 84, no. 3, doi:10.1007/S00340-006-2334-7, ISSN 1432-0649, pages 409 - 414, XP019424623 [Y] 3-7 * page 411, column l, paragraph l - page 413, column r, paragraph 1; figures 4,5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00340-006-2334-7 | International search | [X]JPH09246648 (NIKON CORP) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0054]-[0056], fig. 6 *; | [A]US2006170858 (ALBERT OLIVIER [FR], et al) [A] 1-9 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]CN103259180 (CHINESE ACAD PHYSICS INST) [A] 1-9* entire text, all drawings *; | [XY]JP2015506489 (THALES) [X] 1-2, 8-9 * paragraphs [0013]-[0036], fig. 1-3 * [Y] 3-7; | [A]US2018083407 (SONG DONG HOON [KR], et al) [A] 1-9 * entire text, all drawings *; | [Y] - XIE, N. et al., "Improvement of temporal contrast for ultrashort laser pulses by cross-polarized wave generation", OPTIK, (20120000), vol. 123, doi:10.1016/j.ijleo.2011.05.023, pages 565 - 568, XP055040038 [Y] 3-7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijleo.2011.05.023 | [Y] - JULLIEN, A. et al., "Two crystal arrangement to fight efficiency saturation in cross-polarized wave generation", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20060323), vol. 14, no. 7, pages 2760 - 2769, XP055837884 [Y] 3-7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.14.002760 | by applicant | JP2008299155 | JP2009053505 | JP2014138047 | - Appl. Phys. Lett., (20080000), vol. 92, page 231102 | - Appl. Phys. B, (20110000), vol. 102, pages 769 - 774 | - Opt. Exp., (20110000), vol. 14, page 2760 |