EP4081302 - OLIGONUCLEOTIDES FOR TISSUE SPECIFIC GENE EXPRESSION MODULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Massachusetts One Beacon Street 31st Floor Boston, Massachusetts 02108 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/44] | For all designated states University Of Massachusetts One Beacon Street 31st Floor Boston, Massachusetts 02108 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHVOROVA, Anastasia 10 Rocklawn Road Westborough, Massachusetts 01581 / US | 02 /
FERGUSON, Chantal 36 Johnson Street Worcester, Massachusetts 01604 / US | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Zwicker, Jörk ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [2022/44] | Application number, filing date | 20907413.7 | 23.12.2020 | [2022/44] | WO2020US66891 | Priority number, date | US201962953011P | 23.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962953011 P | [2022/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021133941 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4081302 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61P25/28, C12N15/113 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
A61K47/554 (EP,US);
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
A61K47/542 (EP,US);
A61K47/549 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C12N2310/113 (EP);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US);
C12N2310/315 (EP,US);
C12N2310/322 (US);
C12N2310/344 (EP);
C12N2310/346 (EP);
C12N2310/3515 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3521 (EP);
C12N2310/322, C12N2310/3533 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] | Title | German: | OLIGONUKLEOTIDE ZUR GEWEBESPEZIFISCHEN GENEXPRESSIONSMODULATION | [2022/44] | English: | OLIGONUCLEOTIDES FOR TISSUE SPECIFIC GENE EXPRESSION MODULATION | [2022/44] | French: | OLIGONUCLÉOTIDES SERVANT À LA MODULATION D'EXPRESSION DE GÈNE PROPRE À UN TISSU | [2022/44] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 28.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2016024505 (COLLARD JOSEPH [US], et al) [Y] 4-7, 23-25 * entire document *; | [Y]US2016089453 (ZAMORE PHILLIP D [US], et al) [Y] 10, 11, 22, 29, 30 * entire document *; | [Y]US2016319279 (HUTVAGNER GYORGY [AU], et al) [Y] 9, 27 * entire document *; | [XY]US2017037404 (BROWN DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 12-21, 28, 31-41 * entire document * [Y] 4-11, 22-27, 29, 30; | [A]US2018153833 (TAVAZOIE SOHAIL F [US], et al) [A] 1-41* entire document *; | [Y]US2019247507 (KHVOROVA ANASTASIA [US], et al) [Y] 8, 9, 26, 27 * entire document * |