EP4085660 - METHOD FOR PROVIDING A SPATIALIZED SOUNDFIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | 19.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | 19.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Comhear Inc. 7098 Miratech Drive Suite 130 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLAAR, Jeffrey 10 Hulsea Aliso Viejo, California 92656 / US | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Kuttenkeuler, David SKM-IP PartGmbB Oberanger 45 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/45] | Kuttenkeuler, David Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20908560.4 | 30.12.2020 | [2022/45] | WO2020US67600 | Priority number, date | US201962955380P | 30.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962955380 P | [2022/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021138517 | Date: | 08.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4085660 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 08.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04S3/00, H04R3/00, H04R1/40, H04S7/00, H04R3/12 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
H04R1/403 (EP);
H04S7/304 (US);
H04S7/303 (EP);
H04S7/305 (US);
H04S7/308 (US);
H04R2201/403 (EP);
H04R2201/405 (EP);
H04R2203/12 (EP);
H04R3/12 (EP);
H04S2400/11 (EP);
H04S2420/01 (EP);
H04S2420/13 (EP);
H04S7/301 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/45] | H04S3/00, H04R3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BEREITSTELLEN EINES RÄUMLICHEN SCHALLFELDES | [2022/45] | English: | METHOD FOR PROVIDING A SPATIALIZED SOUNDFIELD | [2022/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR FOURNIR UN CHAMP SONORE SPATIALISÉ | [2022/45] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 20.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.06.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005135643 (LEE JOON-HYUN [KR], et al); | [I]US2014064526 (OTTO PETER [US], et al); | [I]US8824709 (LI YUNHONG [US]) | International search | [A]US6091894 (FUJITA AKIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-86; | [A]US2007286427 (JUNG CHI-HO [KR], et al) [A] 1-86; | [A]US2008025534 (KUHN CLEMENS [CH], et al)[A] 1-86; | [A]US2014064526 (OTTO PETER [US], et al) [A] 1-86 |