EP3964202 - FILM-FORMING COMPOSITION CONTAINING GELLAN GUM AND STARCH, AND APPLICATION IN SOFT CAPSULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sirio Pharma Co., Ltd. No.83 Taishan Rd. Shantou, Guangdong 515000 / CN | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Xufa No.83 Taishan Rd. Shantou, Guangdong 515000 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Qiong No.83 Taishan Rd. Shantou, Guangdong 515000 / CN | 03 /
FANG, Suqiong No.83 Taishan Rd. Shantou, Guangdong 515000 / CN | 04 /
YANG, Xuteng No.83 Taishan Rd. Shantou, Guangdong 515000 / CN | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Becker et Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [2022/10] | Application number, filing date | 20909141.2 | 28.12.2020 | [2022/10] | WO2020CN140148 | Priority number, date | CN201911394755 | 30.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911394755 | [2022/10] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021136169 | Date: | 08.07.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3964202 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/48, A61K47/36 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
A61K9/4816 (EP,CN,US);
A23L29/30 (EP,CN,US);
A61K47/36 (EP,CN,US);
A23L29/272 (EP,CN,US);
A23P10/30 (EP,CN,US);
A23P20/105 (EP);
A61K8/11 (EP);
A61K8/345 (EP);
A61K8/60 (EP);
A61K8/73 (EP);
A61K8/732 (EP);
A61K8/737 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (CN);
A61K2800/92 (EP);
Y02W90/10 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/224, A23V2250/502, A23V2200/228, A23V2250/5118 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Title | German: | GELLANGUMMI UND STÄRKE ENTHALTENDE FILMBILDENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG SOWIE VERWENDUNG IN EINER WEICHEN KAPSEL | [2022/10] | English: | FILM-FORMING COMPOSITION CONTAINING GELLAN GUM AND STARCH, AND APPLICATION IN SOFT CAPSULE | [2022/10] | French: | COMPOSITION FILMOGÈNE CONTENANT DE LA GOMME GELLANE ET DE L'AMIDON, ET APPLICATION EN CAPSULE MOLLE | [2022/10] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2021 | Translation filed | 30.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 25.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013302309 (YANG JOO-HWAN [KR]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XI]US2016136101 (SYDOW GEORG [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,9,14,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0053]; table 2 * [I] 5-8,10-13; | [A] - MORRISON N A ET AL, "Gelatin alternatives for the food industry", PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY AND INDUSTRIAL APPLICATION OF GELLAN GUM : [... PRESENTED AT THE OSAKA CITY UNIVERSITY INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM '98 - JOINT MEETING WITH THE 4TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON HYDROCOLLOIDS (OCUIS98-4ICH) IN OCTOBER 1998], SPRINGER, DE, vol. 114, doi:10.1007/3-540-48349-7_19, ISBN 978-3-540-66389-8, (19991231), pages 127 - 131, (20001110), XP009521249 [A] 1-15 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-48349-7_19 |