EP4085615 - SIGNALING OUTPUT PICTURE SIZE FOR REFERENCE PICTURE RESAMPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 04.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent America LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Byeongdoo c/o TENCENT AMERICA LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 02 /
WENGER, Stephan c/o TENCENT AMERICA LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 03 /
LIU, Shan c/o TENCENT AMERICA LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2022/45] | Application number, filing date | 20909789.8 | 09.11.2020 | [2022/45] | WO2020US59695 | Priority number, date | US201962955514P | 31.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962955514 P | US202017063253 | 05.10.2020 Original published format: US202017063253 | [2022/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021137944 | Date: | 08.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4085615 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/132, H04N19/172, H04N19/70, H04N19/85 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
H04N19/70 (EP,KR);
H04N19/172 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/132 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/122 (KR);
H04N19/146 (KR,US);
H04N19/186 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/45] | H04N13/00, H04N19/33, H04N19/593 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] | Title | German: | SIGNALISIERUNG DER AUSGABEBILDGRÖSSE ZUR REFERENZBILDWIEDERGABE | [2022/45] | English: | SIGNALING OUTPUT PICTURE SIZE FOR REFERENCE PICTURE RESAMPLING | [2022/45] | French: | SIGNALISATION DE TAILLE D'IMAGE DE SORTIE POUR UN RÉÉCHANTILLONNAGE D'IMAGE DE RÉFÉRENCE | [2022/45] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 02.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2020263665 (TENCENT AMERICA LLC [US]) [E] 1-9,11,12 * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0086] *; | [XI] - ARTURO A RODRIGUEZ (CISCO), "Sample scale factor in VUI", no. JCTVC-L0097, (20130116), 12. JCT-VC MEETING; 20130114 - 20130123; GENEVA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16), URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jct/doc_end_user/documents/12_Geneva/wg11/JCTVC-L0097-v2.zip JCTVC-L0097_v2.doc, (20130116), XP030236577 [X] 1,3,11,12 * the whole document * [I] 2,4-10 | [XDI] - WENGER S ET AL, "[AHG19] On Signaling of Adaptive Resolution Change", no. JVET-N0052, (20190313), 14. JVET MEETING; 20190319 - 20190327; GENEVA; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16), URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/14_Geneva/wg11/JVET-N0052-v1.zip JVET-N0052-ARC.docx, (20190313), XP030254631 [XD] 1-9,11,12 * sections 1-3 * [I] 10 | [XI] - SULLIVAN (MICROSOFT) G J, "Draft text for display scale factor hint SEI message as requested in relation to JCTVC-L0097", no. JCTVC-L0450, (20130121), 12. JCT-VC MEETING; 20130114 - 20130123; GENEVA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16), URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jct/doc_end_user/documents/12_Geneva/wg11/JCTVC-L0450-v2.zip JCTVC-L0450-v2.doc, (20130121), XP030236816 [X] 1,3,11,12 * the whole document * [I] 2,4-10 | [XI] - "Text of ISO/IEC FDIS 23000-19 2nd edition Common Media Application Format", no. n18636, (20190912), 127. MPEG MEETING; 20190708 - 20190712; GOTHENBURG; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11), URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/mpeg/doc_end_user/documents/127_Gothenburg/wg11/w18636-v4-w18636.zip 23000-19 Amd1 Amd2 Amd3 (DoC)-r10.pdf, (20190912), XP030206818 [X] 1,11,12 * section 7.5.4 * [I] 2-7 | [XP] - CHOI (TENCENT) B ET AL, "AHG9: On contant picture output", no. JVET-Q0288 ; m51883, (20191231), 17. JVET MEETING; 20200107 - 20200117; BRUSSELS; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/17_Brussels/wg11/JVET-Q0288-v1.zip JVET-Q0288.docx, (20191231), XP030223064 [XP] 1-12 * the whole document * | [A] - Bing Benny, "4.2 H.265 Syntax and Semantics (part)", Next-Generation Video Coding and Streaming, Wiley, (20150828), pages 118 - 118, ISBN 978-1-119-13332-2, XP093110389 [A] 10 * page 118, paragraph l * | International search | [A]US2010150231 (HUANG YEN-JU [TW], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2012092453 (SUH JONG YEUL [KR]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]WO2013105946 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2014269912 (SULLIVAN GARY J [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2015110203 (WANG YE-KUI [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A] - VETRO et al., "Overview of the stereo and multiview video coding extensions of the H. 264/MPEG-4 AVC standard", Proceedings of the IEEE., (20110100), URL: https:/lmerl.com/publications/docsITR2011-022.pdf, (20210104), XP011363626 [A] 1-20 * entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JPROC.2010.2098830 |