EP4064036 - FLOATING-POINT NUMBER MULTIPLICATION COMPUTATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND ARITHMETICAL LOGIC UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Tengyi Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
PAN, Qiuping Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
SHEN, Shengyu Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
XU, Xiaoxin Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Wei Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Huawei European IPR Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/39] | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20909798.9 | 29.12.2020 | [2022/39] | WO2020CN140768 | Priority number, date | CN201911414534 | 31.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911414534 | [2022/39] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021136259 | Date: | 08.07.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4064036 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/487 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
G06F7/4876 (EP);
G06F7/57 (CN);
G06F7/487 (US);
G06F7/485 (US);
G06F7/523 (CN);
Y02D10/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/39] | G06F7/57 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MULTIPLIKATIONSBERECHNUNG VON GLEITKOMMAZAHLEN SOWIE ARITHMETISCHE LOGIKEINHEIT | [2022/39] | English: | FLOATING-POINT NUMBER MULTIPLICATION COMPUTATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND ARITHMETICAL LOGIC UNIT | [2022/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE CALCUL DE MULTIPLICATION DE NOMBRES À VIRGULE FLOTTANTE, ET UNITÉ LOGIQUE ARITHMÉTIQUE | [2022/39] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2022 | Translation filed | 21.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 05.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2019042244 (HENRY GREGORY [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0106]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0118] *; | [X]US2019324723 (GAREGRAT NITIN N [US], et al) [X] 1-16* paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0047]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2019339937 (LO DANIEL [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0063]; figure 5 * |