EP4086143 - COMPOSITE MATERIAL VEHICLE BODY AND COMPOSITE MATERIAL LAYING STRUCTURE AND LAYING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CRRC Qingdao Sifang Co., Ltd. No. 88 Jinhongdong Road Chengyang District Qingdao, Shandong 266111 / CN | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DING, Sansan No. 88, Jinhongdong Road Chengyang District Qingdao, Shandong 266111 / CN | 02 /
XIAO, Peng No. 88, Jinhongdong Road Chengyang District Qingdao, Shandong 266111 / CN | 03 /
GAO, Yulong No. 88, Jinhongdong Road Chengyang District Qingdao, Shandong 266111 / CN | 04 /
ZHAO, Hongwei No. 88, Jinhongdong Road Chengyang District Qingdao, Shandong 266111 / CN | 05 /
WU, Peipei No. 88, Jinhongdong Road Chengyang District Qingdao, Shandong 266111 / CN | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [2022/45] | Application number, filing date | 20909858.1 | 14.05.2020 | [2022/45] | WO2020CN90174 | Priority number, date | CN20201001475 | 02.01.2020 Original published format: CN202010001475 | [2022/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021135034 | Date: | 08.07.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4086143 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B62D29/04, B61D17/00, B29C70/32 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
B61D17/005 (EP);
B62D29/043 (EP,CN,US);
B29C70/16 (EP);
B29C70/30 (US);
B29C70/32 (CN);
B29D99/0017 (EP);
B61D17/00 (CN);
B29K2105/0845 (US);
B29K2307/04 (US);
B62D25/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGKAROSSERIE AUS VERBUNDWERKSTOFF UND VERBUNDWERKSTOFFVERLEGUNGSSTRUKTUR UND -VERLEGUNGSVERFAHREN | [2022/45] | English: | COMPOSITE MATERIAL VEHICLE BODY AND COMPOSITE MATERIAL LAYING STRUCTURE AND LAYING METHOD | [2022/45] | French: | CORPS DE VÉHICULE EN MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE, STRUCTURE DE POSE DE MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE ET PROCÉDÉ DE POSE | [2022/45] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2022 | Translation filed | 06.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 01.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4794032 (FUJII HIDEICHI [JP], et al); | [A]US4966082 (TAKEICHI MICHIFUMI [JP], et al); | [A]US5794402 (DUMLAO CHRIS [US], et al); | [A]EP2660119 (ALSTOM TRANSP TECHNOLOGIES SAS [FR]) | International search | [A]US6060144 (KIMURA ISAO [JP], et al); | [X]CN2723300Y (CAO MING [CN]); | [A]CN209022981U (JIANGYIN NANHONG NEW ENERGY TECH CO LTD); | [PX]CN111098939 (CRRC QINGDAO SIFANG CO LTD) | by applicant | CN20201001475 |