EP4068836 - ACCESS NETWORK SYSTEM, TRANSPORT METHOD, AND RELATED APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Rui Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WEN, Changhui Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LIN, Gang Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Ziqiang Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 20910009.8 | 12.10.2020 | [2022/40] | WO2020CN120351 | Priority number, date | CN201911403283 | 30.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911403283 | [2022/40] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021135490 | Date: | 08.07.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4068836 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/02, H04L45/50 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
H04L45/50 (EP);
H04W28/20 (CN,US);
H04W92/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/40] | H04W24/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Title | German: | ZUGANGSNETZSYSTEM, TRANSPORTVERFAHREN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/40] | English: | ACCESS NETWORK SYSTEM, TRANSPORT METHOD, AND RELATED APPARATUS | [2022/40] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RÉSEAU D'ACCÈS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSPORT, ET APPAREIL ASSOCIÉ | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2022 | Translation filed | 29.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 20.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IAY]EP2611229 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [I] 1,4,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0065] , [0095] - [0107] - [0148] , [0157] , [0166] - [0171] * [A] 2,5-12,14 [Y] 3; | [A]US2019036737 (KLOPER DAVID S [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] - [0049] * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO2019080997 (NOKIA SOLUTIONS & NETWORKS OY [FI]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] - [0052] *; | [YA]CN110278565 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [Y] 3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0057] - [0059] * [A] 1,2,4-14; | [A]US2019313288 (LI HAN [CN], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract ** paragraphs [0048] - [0050] - [0080] , [0082] , [0119] , [0184] * |