EP4064760 - DEVICE CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS, STORAGE MEDIUM AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Xiong NO.18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
HUANG, Junyuan NO.18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 03 /
HUANG, Yuan NO.18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2022/39] | Application number, filing date | 20910204.5 | 23.12.2020 | [2022/39] | WO2020CN138684 | Priority number, date | CN201911396274 | 30.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911396274 | [2022/39] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021136039 | Date: | 08.07.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4064760 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/16, H04W48/20, // H04W76/15, H04W84/12, H04W88/06 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
H04W48/16 (EP,CN);
H04W76/15 (EP,US);
G01S5/0036 (US);
H04B17/318 (US);
H04W48/08 (CN);
H04W48/20 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/39] | H04W48/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG, SPEICHERMEDIUM UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/39] | English: | DEVICE CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS, STORAGE MEDIUM AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2022/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE DISPOSITIF, SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE, ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2022/39] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2022 | Translation filed | 21.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 29.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN106332238 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD) [Y] 4-6,11-13 * abstract *; | [XYI]CN109803325 (OPPO GUANGDONG MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CO LTD) [X] 1,3,5-8,10,12-15 * paragraphs [0087] , [0088] , [0019] , [0113] * [Y] 4-6,11-13 [I] 2,9; | EP3920583 [ ] (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD [CN]); | [Y] - ROBERT J L ET AL, "High rejection filters for 5 GHz concurrent dual-radio WiFi", MICROWAVE CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS (APMC), 2012 ASIA-PACIFIC, IEEE, (20121204), doi:10.1109/APMC.2012.6421556, ISBN 978-1-4577-1330-9, pages 232 - 234, XP032316085 [Y] 4-6,11-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APMC.2012.6421556 | [A] - MING-JU HO ET AL, "IEEE 802.11g OFDM WLAN throughput performance", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 2003. VTC 2003-FALL. 2003 IEEE 58TH ORLANDO, FL, USA 6-9 OCT. 2003; [IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLGY CONFERENCE], PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (20031006), vol. 4, doi:10.1109/VETECF.2003.1285930, ISBN 978-0-7803-7954-1, pages 2252 - 2256, XP010703009 [A] 2,9 * section I. Introduction * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECF.2003.1285930 |