EP4085387 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PREDICTING POWER CONSUMPTION, DEVICE AND READIABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Envision Digital International Pte. Ltd. 1 Harbourfront Avenue, 17-01 Keppel Bay Tower Singapore 098632 / SG | For all designated states Shanghai Envision Digital Co., Ltd. No. 15, Lane 55, Chuanhe Road China (Shanghai) Pilot Free Trade Zone Shanghai / CN | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENG, Qi c/o SHANGHAI ENVISION DIGITAL CO., LTD. No. 15, Lane 55, Chuanhe Road China (Shanghai) Pilot Free Trade Zone Shanghai / CN | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2022/45] | Application number, filing date | 20910349.8 | 23.12.2020 | [2022/45] | WO2020SG50773 | Priority number, date | CN201911405459 | 31.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911405459 | [2022/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021137759 | Date: | 08.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4085387 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SG | 08.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/02, G06Q10/04, G06Q50/06 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
G06Q50/06 (EP,CN,KR);
G05B19/042 (US);
G06N20/00 (KR);
G06N3/02 (KR);
G06Q10/04 (EP,CN,KR);
H02J3/003 (KR,US);
G05B2219/2639 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VORHERSAGE DES ENERGIEVERBRAUCHS, VORRICHTUNG UND LESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/45] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PREDICTING POWER CONSUMPTION, DEVICE AND READIABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE PRÉDICTION DE CONSOMMATION D'ÉNERGIE, DISPOSITIF ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE | [2022/45] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SG | 29.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 12.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/20] | 09.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]CN108932567 (UNIV YANSHAN) [I] 1-11* abstract *; | [I]CN110046787 (UNIV CHONGQING POSTS & TELECOM) [I] 1-11 * figure -; claim - *; | [I]CN110210672 (BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCI & TEC) [I] 1-11 * abstract *; | [I]CN110245798 (TIANJIN ANJIE IOT TECH CO LTD) [I] 1-11 * abstract * | International search | [A]CN107038502 (WUHU POWER SUPPLY CO OF STATE GRID ANHUI ELECTRIC POWER CO, et al) [A] 0* the whole document of the machine translation *; | [X]CN107145976 (UNIV BEIJING SCIENCE & TECH) [X] 1-11 * pages 7, 8, 10 of the machine translation *; | [X]CN110619420 (UNIV GUANGDONG TECHNOLOGY) [X] 1-11 * pages 5-7 of the machine translation * |