EP3943035 - ENDOVASCULAR DRAPES WITH INTEGRATED WATERPROOF GUIDEWIRE DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/04] | LAYING SHEET CONTAINING INTEGRATED GUIDE WIRE USING APPARATUS | ||
[2024/17] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cobes Health Care (Hefei) Co., Ltd. No. 39 Liaoyuan Road Economic Development Zone Feidong Hefei, Anhui 231600 / CN | [2024/37] |
Former [2022/04] | For all designated states Cobes Health Care (Hefei) Co., Ltd. No. 39 Liaoyuan Road Economic Development Zone Feidong Hefei, Anhui 231600 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAO, Ming No. 39 Liaoyuan Road Economic Development Zone Feidong Hefei, Anhui 231600 / CN | 02 /
PATRICK, Lestoquoy 7 Duchess Road Attiches 59551 / FR | [2024/37] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
GAO, Ming Hefei, Anhui 231600 / CN | ||
02 /
PATRICK, Lestoquoy Attiches 59551 / FR | Representative(s) | Kluin Patent Patentanwälte Kluin Debelius Weber PartG mbB Benrather Schlossallee 111 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | [2024/37] |
Former [2022/04] | Tomerius, Isabel Lang & Tomerius Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Rosa-Bavarese-Strasse 5 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20910459.5 | 26.10.2020 | [2022/04] | WO2020CN123548 | Priority number, date | CN201911387548 | 30.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911387548 | [2022/04] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021135556 | Date: | 08.07.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3943035 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3943035 | Date: | 11.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/02, A61B46/23, A61M25/00, A61B46/00, B32B7/09, B32B5/26, B32B7/12, B32B27/32, B32B27/12, // A61M25/09 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
A61B46/23 (EP);
A61B46/10 (CN);
A61B46/40 (EP);
A61M25/002 (EP,CN);
A61M25/09 (EP,CN);
B32B27/12 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B33/00 (CN);
B32B5/02 (CN);
B32B5/022 (EP);
B32B5/024 (EP);
B32B5/06 (CN);
B32B5/08 (CN);
B32B5/26 (CN);
B32B5/277 (EP);
B32B7/09 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP);
B32B2262/02 (CN);
B32B2262/0223 (EP,CN);
B32B2262/0253 (EP,CN);
B32B2262/062 (EP,CN);
B32B2262/065 (EP);
B32B2262/106 (CN);
B32B2262/14 (CN);
B32B2307/412 (EP);
B32B2307/7145 (CN);
B32B2307/726 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2022/04] | A61B46/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENDOVASKULÄRE ABDECKTÜCHER MIT INTEGRIERTEM WASSERDICHTEM FÜHRUNGSDRAHTSPENDER | [2024/17] | English: | ENDOVASCULAR DRAPES WITH INTEGRATED WATERPROOF GUIDEWIRE DISPENSER | [2024/17] | French: | DRAPS ENDOVASCULAIRES AVEC DISTRIBUTEUR DE FIL-GUIDE ÉTANCHE À L'EAU INTÉGRÉ | [2024/17] |
Former [2022/04] | VERLEGEPLATTE MIT INTEGRIERTER FÜHRUNGSDRAHTNUTZUNGSVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2022/04] | LAYING SHEET CONTAINING INTEGRATED GUIDE WIRE USING APPARATUS | ||
Former [2022/04] | FEUILLE DE POSE CONTENANT UN FIL-GUIDE INTÉGRÉ FAISANT APPEL À UN APPAREIL | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2021 | Translation filed | 19.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 06.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5358495 (LYNN LAWRENCE A [US]); | [A]US6436085 (LAUER MARK A [US]); | [A]WO2011025439 (PROBONOVA MEDICAL INNOVATIONS AB [SE], et al); | [A]WO2013036387 (MEDLINE IND INC [US]) |