EP4085064 - LOOPED PROTEINS COMPRISING CELL PENETRATING PEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ohio State Innovation Foundation 1524 North High Street Columbus, OH 43201 / US | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEI, Dehua 1500 Ardwick Road Columbus, Ohio 43220 / US | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2022/45] | Application number, filing date | 20910565.9 | 30.12.2020 | [2022/45] | WO2020US67427 | Priority number, date | US201962955009P | 30.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962955009 P | [2022/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021138397 | Date: | 08.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4085064 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C07K4/00, A61K38/03, A61K38/00, C07K16/44, C12N9/10, C12N9/16, C07K16/00 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
C12N9/16 (EP,US);
C07K14/43595 (US);
C07K16/00 (EP);
C07K16/18 (US);
C07K16/44 (EP);
C12N9/1077 (EP,US);
C12Y204/02001 (EP,US);
C12Y301/03048 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/52 (EP);
C07K2317/569 (EP,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/45] | C07K4/00, A61K38/03 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] | Title | German: | SCHLEIFENPROTEINE, DIE ZELLDURCHDRINGENDE PEPTIDE UMFASSEN | [2022/45] | English: | LOOPED PROTEINS COMPRISING CELL PENETRATING PEPTIDES | [2022/45] | French: | PROTÉINES EN BOUCLE COMPRENANT DES PEPTIDES DE PÉNÉTRATION CELLULAIRE | [2022/45] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 23.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0115511 (UNIV PITTSBURGH [US]); | International search | [A]US2003138932 (MOLLER NIELS PETER HUNDAHL [DE], et al) [A] 5 * ; especially para [0054]; SEQ ID NO: 5 *; | [A]US2003194745 (MCDOWELL ROBERT S [US], et al) [A] 5 * ; especially para [0191]; SEQ ID NO: 109 *; | [XY] - SUN et al., "Establishment of MicroRNA delivery system by PP7 bacteriophage-like particles carrying cell -penetrating peptide", Journal of bioscience and bioengineering, (20170800), vol. 124, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.jbiosc.2017.03.012, pages 242 - 249, XP085114983 [X] 1 * ; especially abstract; pg 1, col 2, para 2; pg 4, col 1, para 4; pg 6, col 2, para 2 * [Y] 2-4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbiosc.2017.03.012 | [YA] - BARFORD D; FLINT A J; TONKS N K, "Crystal Structure of Human Protein Tyrosine Phosphatase 1B", Science, (19940311), vol. 263, no. 5152, doi:10.1126/science.8128219, pages 1397 - 1404, XP002051434 [Y] 2-4 * ; especially abstract; pg 1404, col 1, para 3; Figures 2, 4 * [A] 5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.8128219 | [PX] - CHEN et al., "Engineering Cell-Permeable Proteins through Insertion of Cell-Penetrating Motifs into Surface Loops", ACS chemical society, (20200918), vol. 15, no. 9, doi:10.1021/acschembio.0c00593, pages 2568 - 2576, XP055837925 [PX] 1 * ; entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acschembio.0c00593 |