EP4027267 - METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM FOR IDENTIFYING TEXT IN IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DU, Lin Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
SHEN, Alfred Chixiong Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
PAN, Lemeng Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2022/28] | Application number, filing date | 20910655.8 | 04.12.2020 | [2022/28] | WO2020CN133807 | Priority number, date | CN201911391341 | 30.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911391341 | [2022/28] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021135816 | Date: | 08.07.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4027267 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06V10/774, G06V10/778, G06V10/82, G06V30/18, G06V30/262, G06V30/412, G06V30/416, G06N3/04, G06F40/30 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
G06F40/30 (EP,US);
G06V20/62 (CN);
G06F18/241 (CN);
G06F40/295 (EP,US);
G06N3/044 (EP);
G06N3/045 (EP,CN);
G06N3/08 (CN);
G06N3/088 (EP);
G06V10/449 (CN);
G06V10/774 (EP,US);
G06V10/778 (EP,US);
G06V10/806 (US);
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
G06V30/1444 (US);
G06V30/18057 (EP,US);
G06V30/274 (EP,CN,US);
G06V30/412 (EP,US);
G06V30/416 (EP,US);
G06V30/10 (CN)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/28] | G06K9/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUM IDENTIFIZIEREN VON TEXT IN EINEM BILD | [2022/28] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM FOR IDENTIFYING TEXT IN IMAGE | [2022/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET SYSTÈME D'IDENTIFICATION D'UN TEXTE DANS UNE IMAGE | [2022/28] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2022 | Translation filed | 06.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 06.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 05.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN108536679 (TENCENT TECH CHENGDU CO LTD); | [Y]EP3570208 (SAP SE [DE]); | [XYI]CN110569846 (BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCI & TEC); | US2021081729 [ ] (HUANG XIANGKAI [CN], et al); |