EP4085327 - VEHICLE AUTOMATED UNLOADING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 24.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Purdue Research Foundation 1801 Newman Road West Lafayette, Indiana 47906 / US | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PURYK, Corwin Marcus 1800 N. 158th St. Silvis, Illinois 61282 / US | 02 /
CORBAN, Stephen Robert 1800 N. 158th St. Silvis, Illinois 61282 / US | 03 /
WHITE, Ryan Robert 1800 N. 158th St. Silvis, Illinois 61282 / US | 04 /
SHAVER, Gregory Matthew 585 Purdue Mall West Lafayette, Indiana 47909 / US | 05 /
DHAMANKAR, Shveta Vinayak 585 Purdue Mall West Lafayette, Indiana 47909 / US | 06 /
EVANS, John Thomas 585 Purdue Mall West Lafayette, Indiana 47909 / US | 07 /
LIU, Ziping 585 Purdue Mall West Lafayette, Indiana 47909 / US | 08 /
JIANG, Chufan 585 Purdue Mall West Lafayette, Indiana 47909 / US | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Holst, Sönke John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Mannheim Regional Center Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2022/45] | Application number, filing date | 20911111.1 | 29.12.2020 | [2022/45] | WO2020US67379 | Priority number, date | US201962956013P | 31.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962956013 P | US202017114971 | 08.12.2020 Original published format: US202017114971 | [2022/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021138371 | Date: | 08.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4085327 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A01D41/12, A01D41/127, // A01D43/08 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
A01D41/1217 (EP);
A01D90/10 (US);
A01D41/127 (EP);
A01D43/073 (US);
B65G67/24 (US);
A01D43/087 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/45] | G06F7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHES ENTLADEN EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2022/45] | English: | VEHICLE AUTOMATED UNLOADING | [2022/45] | French: | DÉCHARGEMENT AUTOMATISÉ DE VÉHICULE | [2022/45] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 01.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 15.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2014083556 (DARR MATTHEW J [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0031] , [0038] , [0040] , [0057] - [0059] - [0064] - [0069] - [0094] , [0096] , [0104] , [0107] - [0115] - [0126] , [0127] , [0130]; figures 1A, 8A-8D, 9, 12, 13 *; | [A]GB2517049 (DEERE & CO [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0110]; figures 1A-2B, 8A-12 *; | [A]EP2579701 (CNH IND BELGIUM NV [BE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028]; figures 1, 3-5, 7, 8; claims 1-11 *; | [A]DE102018201554 (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] 4 * paragraph [0023]; figures 1-3; claims 1-3 * | International search | [X]US2014083556 (DARR MATTHEW J [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * ; figs 8D, 9, 12, 13; paras [0094], [0107], [0112], [0113], [0126], [0127], [0130]. *; | [A]WO2018185522 (GRAF PLESSEN MOGENS [CH]) [A] 1-15* ; entire document. * | by applicant | DE102011082052 | US2014083556 |