EP4055858 - NETWORK ACCESS VIA DEVICE IDENTIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring TX 77389 / US | [2022/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE SOUSA MARCHESE, Tadeu Av. Ipiranga, 6681, Bldg 45C Predios 5-6, TecnoPuc 90619 Porto Alegre / BR | 02 /
FRANCISCO CAGNINI CIOCARI, Juliano Av. Ipiranga, 6681, Bldg 45C Predios 5-6, TecnoPuc 90619 Porto Alegre / BR | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/37] | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 20911969.2 | 07.01.2020 | [2022/37] | WO2020US12626 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021141574 | Date: | 15.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4055858 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 15.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/06, H04L9/40 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
H04L63/0884 (EP);
H04W12/08 (US);
H04L63/10 (EP);
H04W12/69 (US)
|
Former IPC [2022/37] | H04W12/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/37] | Title | German: | NETZWERKZUGRIFF ÜBER GERÄTEIDENTIFIKATOR | [2022/37] | English: | NETWORK ACCESS VIA DEVICE IDENTIFIER | [2022/37] | French: | ACCÈS À UN RÉSEAU PAR L'INTERMÉDIAIRE D'UN IDENTIFIANT DE DISPOSITIF | [2022/37] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/37] | 15.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012052806 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [A]EP3522668 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) | International search | [A]US2003233332 (KEELER JAMES D [US], et al)[A] 1-15; | [A]US2012284778 (CHIOU SCOTT L [US], et al) [A] 1-15; | [X]US2015223068 (THELEN CHRISTIAN OLIVER [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * , paragraphs [0007], [0010], [0012], [0028], [0034], [0035], [0044], [0045], [0050], [0052], [0056], [0060], [0064], [0077], [0080], [0092] *; | [A]WO2017205959 (LEFT OF THE DOT MEDIA INC [CA]) [A] 1-15 |