EP4092292 - GEARBOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pan, Guotao Room 302, Unit 3, Building 2 Shuiyanyuan, Guangye Street Gongshu District Hangzhou Zhejiang 310011 / CN | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Chaillot 16/20, avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 20913266.1 | 14.12.2020 | [2022/47] | WO2020CN136018 | Priority number, date | CN20201056207 | 18.01.2020 Original published format: CN202010056207 | CN202020114423U | 18.01.2020 Original published format: CN 202020114423 U | [2022/47] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021143420 | Date: | 22.07.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4092292 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F16H3/72 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
F16H3/722 (EP);
F16H1/28 (US);
F16H57/02 (US);
F16H57/0424 (US);
F16H57/043 (US);
F16H57/082 (US);
F16H2057/085 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/47] | F16H48/27, F16H48/11 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] | Title | German: | GETRIEBE | [2022/47] | English: | GEARBOX | [2022/47] | French: | BOÎTE DE VITESSES | [2022/47] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2022 | Translation filed | 18.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 18.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 05.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.06.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0822355 (JONG MAUD DE [NL]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]CN209164522U (PAN GUOTAO) [A] 1-5* figures 1-2 * |