EP4093173 - COMPONENT SUPPLY UNIT ARRANGEMENT HANDLING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Corporation 19, Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu-shi, Aichi 472-8686 / JP | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWASAKI Masataka c/o FUJI CORPORATION, 19, Chausuyama, Yamamachi Chiryu-shi, Aichi 472-8686 / JP | 02 /
NOZAWA Mizuho c/o FUJI CORPORATION, 19, Chausuyama, Yamamachi Chiryu-shi, Aichi 472-8686 / JP | 03 /
UCHIDA Shinichiro c/o FUJI CORPORATION, 19, Chausuyama, Yamamachi Chiryu-shi, Aichi 472-8686 / JP | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 20914121.7 | 14.01.2020 | [2022/47] | WO2020JP00930 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021144863 | Date: | 22.07.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4093173 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H05K13/02, H05K13/08 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
H05K13/086 (EP,US);
H05K13/021 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/47] | H05K13/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] | Title | German: | KOMPONENTEZUFUHREINHEITS- ANORDNUNGS-HANDHABUNGSSYSTEM | [2022/47] | English: | COMPONENT SUPPLY UNIT ARRANGEMENT HANDLING SYSTEM | [2022/47] | French: | SYSTÈME D'INSTALLATION D'UNITÉS D'ALIMENTATION EN COMPOSANTS | [2022/47] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2022 | Translation filed | 14.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 15.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2018220560 (OTSUKA TOSHIHIDE [JP], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [IAY]WO2019142336 (FUJI CORP [JP]) [I] 1-6,9,10,12,13 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0082]; figures 7, 10 * [A] 11 [Y] 7,8; | [Y]WO2019159319 (FUJI CORP [JP]) [Y] 7,8 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0023]; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]JP2014197594 (FUJI MACHINE MFG) [Y] 1-2,4-10,13 * [0024], [0032] *; | [Y]WO2018127956 (FUJI CORP [JP]) [Y] 6-10, 13 * [0 0 1 7], [0033]-[0036], [1] *; | [YA]JP2018125383 (PANASONIC IP MAN CORP) [Y] 1-2,4-10,13 * [0 0 1 2] - [0 0 2 7], [0050], [0058], [1] - [3] * [A] 3,11-12; | [Y]JP2019091771 (JUKI KK, et al) [Y] 1-2,4-10,13 * [0014], [0020]-[0021], [0046] -[004 7], [1 ], [5 ] *; | [Y]WO2019159319 (FUJI CORP [JP]) [Y] 7-10, 13* [001 9] - [0 0 2 0], [0023], [1] * | by applicant | WO2019142336 |