EP4053057 - REWINDING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hokeon F.A Co., Ltd. 214-43, Wolsan-ro Eumbong-myeon Asan-si Chungcheongnam-do 31418 / KR | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 150-20, Gongse-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17084 / KR | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Myung Gi 104-190, 33, 3gongdan 6-ro, Seobuk-gu Cheonan-si Chungcheongnam-do 31085 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Hyun Seok 150-20, Gongse-ro, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17084 / KR | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 20914269.4 | 26.11.2020 | [2022/36] | WO2020KR16984 | Priority number, date | KR20200004994 | 14.01.2020 Original published format: KR 20200004994 | [2022/36] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021145556 | Date: | 22.07.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4053057 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B65H19/18, B65H19/26, B65H19/22, B65H18/10 | [2024/37] | CPC: |
B65H19/2215 (EP,US);
B65H19/1868 (KR);
B65H18/106 (EP);
B65H19/12 (KR);
B65H19/20 (KR,US);
B65H19/26 (EP,US);
B65H2301/41362 (EP);
B65H2406/30 (EP);
B65H2701/11332 (EP,US);
B65H2701/37 (KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/36] | B65H19/18, B65H19/12, B65H19/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Title | German: | AUFWICKELSYSTEM | [2022/36] | English: | REWINDING SYSTEM | [2022/36] | French: | SYSTÈME DE REBOBINAGE | [2022/36] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2022 | Translation filed | 31.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 31.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR20050080209 (ILJIN A TECH CO LTD [KR]); | [XA]US7896283 (TAUBER ADOLF [AT], et al); | [A]KR101553167B (HAN CHUL KEUN [KR]) | International search | [A]KR0145960B (DO CHOL KI [KR], et al); | [Y]KR20050080209 (ILJIN A TECH CO LTD [KR]); | [A]JP2005320107 (FUSO GOSEI KK, et al); | [A]KR101431784B ; | [A]KR101553167B (HAN CHUL KEUN [KR]); | [PX]KR102145059B (HOKEON F A CO LTD [KR]) |