EP4096268 - TERMINAL, WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 06.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMURA, Yuki c/o Intellectual Property Department, NTT DOCOMO INC., SANNO PARK TOWER, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
NAGATA, Satoshi c/o Intellectual Property Department, NTT DOCOMO INC., SANNO PARK TOWER, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
WANG, Jing c/o DOCOMO Beijing Communications Laboratories Co. Ltd., 7/F, Raycom Infotech Park A, No.2 Kexueyuan South Road, Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | 04 /
GUO, Shaozhen c/o DOCOMO Beijing Communications Laboratories Co. Ltd., 7/F, Raycom Infotech Park A, No.2 Kexueyuan South Road, Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | 05 /
HOU, Xiaolin c/o DOCOMO Beijing Communications Laboratories Co. Ltd., 7/F, Raycom Infotech Park A, No.2 Kexueyuan South Road, Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 20915366.7 | 24.01.2020 | [2022/48] | WO2020JP02635 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021149264 | Date: | 29.07.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4096268 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/28, H04W72/04, H04B7/06, H04B7/0404, H04L5/00 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
H04B7/0404 (EP);
H04W16/28 (US);
H04B7/0695 (EP);
H04B7/06968 (EP);
H04L5/0023 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/48] | H04W16/28, H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Title | German: | BENUTZERENDGERÄT, DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND BASISSTATION | [2022/48] | English: | TERMINAL, WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND BASE STATION | [2022/48] | French: | TERMINAL, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL, ET STATION DE BASE | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2022 | Translation filed | 10.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 05.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2018232090 (IDAC HOLDINGS INC [US]) [X] 1,3,5,6 * paragraphs [0250] - [0252] * [Y] 2; | [XI]WO2019195528 (IDAC HOLDINGS INC [US]) [X] 1,5,6 * paragraphs [0109] - [0110] - [ 168] - [0173]; figures 5, 13, 14 * [I] 2-4; | [IY] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Feature lead summary#4 of Enhancements on Multi-beam Operations", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, CZ; 20190826 - 20190830, (20190903), pages 1 - 38, 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1909779 R1#98 FL_SUMMARY_MULTIBEAM(MB1) V8, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_98/Docs/R1-1909779.zip, (20190903), XP051766371 [I] 1,4-6 * Section 2 * [Y] 2 | [Y] - ZTE, "Enhancements on multi-beam operation", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, CZ; 20190826 - 20190830, (20190817), pages 1 - 26, 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1908192 ENHANCEMENTS ON MULTI-BEAM OPERATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_98/Docs/R1-1908192.zip, (20190817), XP051764811 [Y] 2 * Section 2 * | International search | [XY] - Spreadtrum Communications, "Discussion on multi-beam operation", 3GPP Draft; R1-1908959_Discussion on multi-beam operation_final, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20190817), vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, CZ; 20190826 - 20190830, XP051765565 [X] 1, 4-6 * 1, 2. 2 1, 2. 2 * [Y] 2-3 | [Y] - ZTE, "Enhancements on multi-beam operation", 3GPP Draft; R1-1908192 Enhancements on Multi-beam Operation, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20190817), vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, CZ; 20190826 - 20190830, pages 1 - 26, XP051764811 [Y] 2-3 * 2.1.1 * |