EP4063325 - SECONDARY-BATTERY POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL, SECONDARY-BATTERY POSITIVE ELECTRODE, AND SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENDOH Kazuaki c/o Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd., 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | 02 /
KUBOTA Hironobu c/o Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd., 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/39] | Application number, filing date | 20917128.9 | 14.12.2020 | [2022/39] | WO2020JP46511 | Priority number, date | JP20200015696 | 31.01.2020 Original published format: JP 2020015696 | [2022/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021153044 | Date: | 05.08.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4063325 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C01G51/00, C07F7/04, C07F7/18, H01M4/36, H01M4/505, H01M4/525, H01M10/052, H01M10/0566 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
H01M4/366 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (US);
H01M4/131 (EP);
H01M4/364 (EP);
H01M4/505 (EP,US);
H01M4/525 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Title | German: | AKTIVES MATERIAL EINER POSITIVEN SEKUNDÄRBATTERIEELEKTRODE, POSITIVE SEKUNDÄRBATTERIEELEKTRODE UND SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2022/39] | English: | SECONDARY-BATTERY POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL, SECONDARY-BATTERY POSITIVE ELECTRODE, AND SECONDARY BATTERY | [2022/39] | French: | MATÉRIAU ACTIF D'ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE DE BATTERIE SECONDAIRE, ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE DE BATTERIE SECONDAIRE ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE | [2022/39] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2022 | Translation filed | 21.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2011113783 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-10; | [A]WO2015072359 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO [JP]) [A] 1-10; | [A]JP2018088400 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB CO LTD) [A] 1-10; | [PA]JP2020161213 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al)[PA] 1-10 | by applicant | JP2011034776 | JP2011049161 | JP2012169249 | JP2012199101 | JP2013191539 |