EP4102442 - MANUFACTURING ORDER PLACEMENT SUPPORT DEVICE, METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT Communications Corporation 2-3-1, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8019 / JP | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKABORI, Hideaki c/o NTT Communications Corporation 2-3-1 Otemachi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8019 / JP | 02 /
KITA, Yujiro c/o NTT Communications Corporation 2-3-1 Otemachi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8019 / JP | 03 /
YAMAKAWA, Kazuhiro c/o NTT Communications Corporation 2-3-1 Otemachi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8019 / JP | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Frankfurter Straße 3 C 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/50] | Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Frankfurter Straße 3 C 38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 20917431.7 | 02.10.2020 | [2022/50] | WO2020JP37572 | Priority number, date | JP20200020041 | 07.02.2020 Original published format: JP 2020020041 | [2022/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021157132 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4102442 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/04, G06Q30/08, G06Q30/06 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
G06Q50/04 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0611 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP);
G06Q30/08 (EP);
Y02P90/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/50] | G06Q50/04, G06Q30/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER FERTIGUNGSREIHENFOLGE | [2022/50] | English: | MANUFACTURING ORDER PLACEMENT SUPPORT DEVICE, METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2022/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME D'AIDE À LA PASSATION DE COMMANDE DE FABRICATION | [2022/50] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2022 | Translation filed | 29.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 29.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2001283044 (CLASS TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) | International search | [Y]JP2002222191 (TAKATSU DENDO SEIKI KK); | [XY]JP2002342606 (AMADA CO LTD); | [Y]JP2004102732 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2002189758 |