EP4102452 - RE-IDENTIFICATION DEVICE, RE-IDENTIFICATION PROGRAM, AND RE-IDENTIFICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.09.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA MINOLTA, INC. 2-7-2, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAKI, Tatsuya c/o KONICA MINOLTA, INC., 2-7-2 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 20917699.9 | 07.10.2020 | [2022/50] | WO2020JP37961 | Priority number, date | JP20200016444 | 03.02.2020 Original published format: JP 2020016444 | [2022/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021157133 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4102452 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, G06T7/292, H04N7/18, G06V10/82, G06V20/52, G06V40/20 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
H04N7/181 (EP);
G06T7/292 (EP);
G06V10/82 (EP);
G06V20/52 (EP);
G06V40/23 (EP);
G06T2207/20084 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/50] | G06T7/00, G06T7/292, H04N7/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Title | German: | NEUIDENTIFIZIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, NEUIDENTIFIZIERUNGSPROGRAMM UND NEUIDENTIFIZIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2022/50] | English: | RE-IDENTIFICATION DEVICE, RE-IDENTIFICATION PROGRAM, AND RE-IDENTIFICATION METHOD | [2022/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉ-IDENTIFICATION, PROGRAMME DE RÉ-IDENTIFICATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE RE-IDENTIFICATION | [2022/50] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2022 | Translation filed | 28.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 29.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.09.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2018253596 (BARMAN ARKO [US], et al); | International search | [YA]JP2014192700 (PANASONIC CORP); | [YA]JP2019036213 (SECOM CO LTD); | [YA]JP2019096062 (KONICA MINOLTA INC); | [Y]JP2019186859 (KDDI CORP) | by applicant | JP2016072964 | JP2020016444 |