EP4074122 - NETWORK DEVICE AND METHOD THEREIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2023/14] |
Former [2022/42] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Huaisong No. 5 Lize East Street, Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Chunhui No. 5 Lize East Street, Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2022/42] | Application number, filing date | 20917834.2 | 07.02.2020 | [2022/42] | WO2020CN74518 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021155583 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4074122 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04W8/18, // H04W24/10 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
H04L5/0057 (EP);
H04W24/10 (EP,US);
H04B7/0626 (US);
H04L5/005 (EP);
H04L5/0051 (US);
H04W76/30 (US);
H04W8/183 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/42] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Title | German: | NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN DARIN | [2022/42] | English: | NETWORK DEVICE AND METHOD THEREIN | [2022/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU ET PROCÉDÉ EN SON SEIN | [2022/42] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 08.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011077003 (SHIN SANG MIN [KR]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0011] - [0030] - [0048] *; | [XYI]EP3258717 (INTEL IP CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,9-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0020] - [0042] * [Y] 4 [I] 3,5-8; | [XYI]WO2018141081 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [X] 1,7,9-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0082] - [0101] * [Y] 4 [I] 2,3,5,6,8; | [E]WO2021092744 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [E] 1,10-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0020] , [0043] - [0056] - [0067] - [0072] *; | [A] - VIVO, "vivo views on NR Rel-17", vol. TSG RAN, no. Newport Beach, USA; 20190603 - 20190606, (20190602), 3GPP DRAFT; RP-190833 VIVO VIEWS ON REL-17, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN/Docs/RP%2D190833%2Ezip, (20190602), XP051746117 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [A]CN102461012 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2014185495 (KUCHIBHOTLA RAVI [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]CN107404764 (ALCATEL LUCENT SHANGHAI BELL, et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]US2017367085 (CHAKRABORTY SOUMEN [IN]) [X] 1-12 * description, paragraphs [0024]-[0101] *; | [A] - Huawei, HiSilicon, "UE-cell-center-like Design Principles and Tracking Signal Design", 3GPP Draft; R1-167205, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20160821), vol. RAN WG1, no. Gothenburg, Sweden; 20160822 - 20160826, XP051125773 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP3258717 | WO2018141081 |