EP4101363 - ROBOT CLEANER AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Youngsub IP Center, LG Electronics Inc., 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 02 /
YOO, Hwan IP Center, LG Electronics Inc., 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 20917972.0 | 13.08.2020 | [2022/50] | WO2020KR10710 | Priority number, date | KR20200014470 | 06.02.2020 Original published format: KR 20200014470 | [2022/50] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021157799 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4101363 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A47L11/40, A47L9/28, B25J11/00, B25J19/02, B25J19/06 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
A47L11/282 (EP,US);
A47L11/4011 (KR,US);
A47L11/4005 (US);
A47L11/4038 (EP,KR,US);
A47L11/4061 (EP);
A47L11/4066 (KR,US);
A47L11/4069 (KR,US);
A47L11/4072 (EP);
A47L9/2889 (KR);
B25J11/0085 (KR);
B25J19/02 (KR);
B25J19/021 (KR);
B25J19/06 (KR);
G05D1/0238 (US);
A47L2201/04 (EP,KR,US);
A47L2201/06 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSROBOTER UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2022/50] | English: | ROBOT CLEANER AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF | [2022/50] | French: | ROBOT DE NETTOYAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE ASSOCIÉ | [2022/50] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2022 | Translation filed | 05.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 05.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 12.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]KR20180025724 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 6 * paragraph [0036] * * paragraphs [0098] - [0107] * [A] 2-5,7-15 [Y] 1; | [YA]US2018368642 (SON HYUNG MIN [KR], et al) [Y] 1 * paragraphs [0135] , [0136] * [A] 2-15; | [YA]EP3440980 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1 * paragraphs [0033] - [0051] * [A] 2-15; | [YA]EP3501364 (LUO JICHUAN [CN]) [Y] 1 * paragraphs [0069] - [0071] * [A] 2-15; | [YA]US2019200823 (SONG ZHANGJUN [CN], et al) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0003] *[A] 2-15 | International search | [Y]KR20160048492 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 10-11 * See paragraphs [0088]-[0090] and figure 3. *; | [Y]KR20180025724 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1-11,16-17 * See paragraphs [0028]-[0041], [0102]-[0117] and [0172]-[0180] and figures 5, 10-11 and 18. *; | [AY]KR20190007905 (EVERYBOT INC [KR]) [A] 12-15 * See paragraphs [0119]-[0120] and [0132]-[0173] and figures 1-13. * [Y] 1-11,16-17; | [A]KR101918228B [A] 1-17 * See paragraphs [0021]-[0071] and figures 1-6. *; | [A]KR102023966B [A] 1-17* See claims 1-19 and figures 1-5. * | by applicant | KR100657530B | KR101602790B |