EP4104397 - CONTROL RESOURCE SET PRECODING INDICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Qiaoyu 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
WEI, Chao 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
LEI, Jing 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
XU, Huilin 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
ANG, Peter Pui Lok 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 06 /
XU, Hao 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 07 /
CHEN, Wanshi 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 08 /
DAI, Jing 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 09 /
HUANG, Min 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2022/51] | Application number, filing date | 20918253.4 | 10.02.2020 | [2022/51] | WO2020CN74620 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021159232 | Date: | 19.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4104397 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/02, H04L5/00, H04W72/23 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
H04L25/0228 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (US)
|
Former IPC [2022/51] | H04L25/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] | Title | German: | ANZEIGE EINER KONTROLLRESSOURCENSATZVORKODIERUNG | [2022/51] | English: | CONTROL RESOURCE SET PRECODING INDICATION | [2022/51] | French: | INDICATION DE PRÉCODAGE D'ENSEMBLE DE RESSOURCES DE COMMANDE | [2022/51] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 13.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2018204333 (SHARP LABORATORIES AMERICA INC [US]); | [YA]EP3471297 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | International search | [A]WO2018204333 (SHARP LABORATORIES AMERICA INC [US]) [A] 1-35 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2019062604 (VIVO MOBILE COMMUNICATION CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-35 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2019174593 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [A] 1-35* the whole document *; | [A] - NTT DOCOMO, INC., "Offline summary for AI 7.1.3.1.1 PDCCH structure", 3GPP Draft; R1-1805537, Sanya, China, (20180416), vol. RAN WG1, pages 1 - 27, XP051427555 [A] 1-35 * pages 9, 12-13, 16 * | by applicant | - NTT DOCOMO et al., "Summary of key aspects for PDCCH structure", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-i7i8833_SUMMARY_AI_7311, (20171009), vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague |