EP4109986 - DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND COMMUNICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Yuanyuan No.018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33, Middle Xierqi Road, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2022/52] | Application number, filing date | 20919564.3 | 20.02.2020 | [2022/52] | WO2020CN76059 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021163969 | Date: | 26.08.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4109986 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
H04L5/0044 (EP);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04W36/0085 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/52] | H04W72/04, H04W72/10, H04W72/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG SOWIE KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/52] | English: | DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND COMMUNICATION DEVICE | [2022/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES, ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION | [2022/52] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2022 | Translation filed | 19.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 19.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 02.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN101686551 (DATANG MOBILE COMM EQUIP CO) [A] 1-20 * description, pages 2-8, and figures 1-9 *; | [A]CN108024233 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]CN108282896 (CHINA ACADEMY TELECOMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2019357203 (XING YANPING [CN], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A] - ETSI MCC, "Report of 3GPP TSG RAN2#107bis meeting, Chongqing, China", 3GPP Draft; R2-1914301, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20191117), no. ; 20191014 - 20191018, XP051826004 [A] 1-20 * entire document * |