EP4109465 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MANAGING THERAPY PLAN DATA, AND DATA EXCHANGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neuboron Therapy System Ltd. No. 2036 Wengjiao West Road, Haicang District Xiamen, Fujian 361026 / CN | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Xiao No.2060 Wengjiao West Road Haicang District, Xiamen Fujian Province, 361026 P.R. / CN | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/52] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20919891.0 | 04.12.2020 | [2022/52] | WO2020CN133830 | Priority number, date | CN20201097538 | 17.02.2020 Original published format: CN202010097538 | [2022/52] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021164372 | Date: | 26.08.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4109465 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G16H40/40, G16H40/67, G16H30/20, G16H20/00, H04L65/40, H04L67/565, H04L69/08 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
G16H30/20 (EP);
G16H40/60 (CN,US);
G16H20/00 (EP,CN,US);
G16H40/40 (EP);
G16H40/67 (EP);
H04L67/02 (CN,US);
H04L67/06 (CN,US);
H04L67/565 (EP,CN);
H04L69/08 (EP,CN);
H04L69/16 (CN)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/52] | G16H40/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERWALTUNG VON THERAPIEPLANDATEN UND DATENAUSTAUSCHVORRICHTUNG | [2022/52] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MANAGING THERAPY PLAN DATA, AND DATA EXCHANGE DEVICE | [2022/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE DONNÉES DE PLAN DE THÉRAPIE ET DISPOSITIF D'ÉCHANGE DE DONNÉES | [2022/52] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2021 | Translation filed | 22.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]KR20090119522 (SEOUL CNJ CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-4,7-15 * p.5 l.8-35, p.6 l.20-29, p.7 l.1-19, p.7 l.27-37, p.8 l.6-23, p.11 l.2-24;; figures 1-2, 4 * [I] 5,6; | [XI]WO2012125980 (CAREFUSION 303 INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-15 * [0002]-[0003], [0042]-[0043], [0046]-[0047], [0052]-[0053];; figures 1A-1B, 2A-2B *[I] 5,6 |