EP4108329 - ION EXCHANGE EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha F.C.C. 7000-36 Nakagawa Hosoe-cho Kita-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 431-1394 / JP | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INO Kentaro c/o Kabushiki Kaisha F.C.C. Gijutsu-Kenkyu-Jo, 7000-46, Nakagawa, Hosoe-cho, Kita-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 431-1304 / JP | 02 /
HIGUCHI Hironori c/o Kabushiki Kaisha F.C.C. Gijutsu-Kenkyu-Jo, 7000-46, Nakagawa, Hosoe-cho, Kita-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 431-1304 / JP | 03 /
ENDO Makiko c/o Kabushiki Kaisha F.C.C. Gijutsu-Kenkyu-Jo, 7000-46, Nakagawa, Hosoe-cho, Kita-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 431-1304 / JP | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/52] | Application number, filing date | 20920560.8 | 02.12.2020 | [2022/52] | WO2020JP44922 | Priority number, date | JP20200024851 | 18.02.2020 Original published format: JP 2020024851 | [2022/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021166368 | Date: | 26.08.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4108329 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B01J47/00, B01J47/12, C02F1/42 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
B01D15/361 (EP,US);
B01J47/00 (IL);
B01J47/12 (IL,KR,US);
B01D61/461 (US);
B01D61/463 (US);
B01D61/48 (US);
B01D63/021 (US);
B01D63/061 (US);
B01D63/081 (US);
B01D63/087 (US);
B01D67/0088 (US);
B01D67/009 (US);
B01D69/02 (US);
B01J47/04 (US);
B01J47/08 (US);
B01J47/127 (US);
C02F1/42 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C02F1/44 (EP,US);
C02F1/469 (EP);
C02F1/4693 (US);
C02F1/4695 (US);
B01D2311/08 (US);
B01D2313/345 (US);
B01D2313/40 (US);
B01D2315/10 (US);
B01D2323/02 (US);
B01D2323/34 (US);
B01D2325/36 (US);
B01D2325/42 (EP,US);
B01D61/243 (EP);
C02F2001/422 (EP,US);
C02F2001/425 (EP,US);
C02F2103/023 (US);
C02F2201/004 (EP);
C02F2201/46165 (EP);
C02F2201/4617 (EP);
Y02A20/124 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Title | German: | IONENAUSTAUSCHVORRICHTUNG | [2022/52] | English: | ION EXCHANGE EQUIPMENT | [2022/52] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT ÉCHANGEUR D'IONS | [2022/52] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2022 | Translation filed | 17.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 17.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 06.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/41] | 04.09.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP3645636B (PERMELEC ELECTRODE LTD) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0013] - [0016]; figures 1,2 * [I] 4-13; | [A]EP1682451 (UNITED STATES FILTER CORP [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0029] , [0032]; figure 2 *; | [XI]EP2338841 (SPRING CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0023] - [0024]; figures 1-2 * [I] 3-13; | [XI]US2013168249 (VOLKEL ARMIN R [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8 * paragraphs [0006] , [0028] , [0032] , [0051] - [0052]; figures 1-7 * [I] 3-7,9-13; | [A]CN105056763 (UNIV HENAN TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-13* paragraphs [0004] - [0010]; figures 1-2 *; | [XI]WO2018119280 (UNIV IOWA RES FOUND [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 25 * * page 7, lines 3-26; figures 2-4,7,8 * [I] 3-13 | International search | [A]JPH0671292 (KURITA WATER IND LTD) [A] 1-13* , paragraphs [0015]-[0032], fig. 1, 2 *; | [XA]JP2010094622 (SPRING KK) [X] 1-3, 5-8, 10-13 * , paragraphs [0021]-[0037], fig. 1, 2, 5, paragraphs [0021]-[0037], fig. 1, 2, 5 * [A] 4, 9; | [XA]JP2012228669 (PANASONIC CORP) [X] 1, 3-5, 8, 12 * , paragraphs [0035]-[0055], fig. 1, 2, paragraphs [0035]-[0055], fig. 1, 2 * [A] 2, 6, 7, 9-11,13; | [XA]JP2012236171 (PANASONIC CORP) [X] 1, 3-5, 8, 12 * , paragraphs [0034]-[0056], fig. 1, 2, paragraphs [0034]-[0056], fig. 1, 2 * [A] 2, 6, 7, 9-11, 13; | [A]JP2014168732 (ORGANO KK) [A] 1-13 * , paragraphs [0020]-[0042], fig. 1, 4 * | by applicant | JPS6214948 | JP2002136968 |