EP4107388 - ELECTRIC MACHINE GEARBOX AND ENGINE STARTER AND POWER GENERATOR INCLUDING GEARBOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 24.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | 24.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLVO TRUCK CORPORATION 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIEBERUM, Nicholas 39 Winslow Court Gettysburg, PA 17325 / US | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 2096 403 12 Göteborg / SE | [2022/52] | Application number, filing date | 20920652.3 | 23.02.2020 | [2022/52] | WO2020US19384 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021167624 | Date: | 26.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4107388 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F02N15/00, F02N15/04, F02N15/06, F16H3/44, F16H3/54, F16H37/04, B60K6/365, B60K6/383, B60K6/387, B60K6/485, F01D15/10, F01D21/00, F02C7/275, F02C7/32, F02C7/36, // F02N15/02, F02N11/04, B60K6/26, B60K6/48 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
B60K6/365 (EP,US);
F02N11/04 (EP,US);
B60K6/383 (EP);
B60K6/387 (EP);
B60K6/485 (EP,US);
F01D15/10 (EP);
F01D21/006 (EP);
F02C7/275 (EP);
F02C7/32 (EP);
F02C7/36 (EP);
F02N15/003 (EP);
F02N15/046 (EP);
F16H3/54 (EP);
F16H37/046 (EP);
B60K2006/268 (EP,US);
B60K2006/4841 (EP);
F02N15/006 (EP);
F02N15/023 (EP);
F02N15/026 (EP);
F05D2260/40311 (EP);
F16H2200/0021 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/52] | F02N15/04, B60K6/26, F02N11/00, F02N15/00, F02N15/02, F02N15/06, F16H3/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES MASCHINENGETRIEBE UND MOTORSTARTER UND LEISTUNGSGENERATOR MIT EINEM SOLCHEN GETRIEBE | [2022/52] | English: | ELECTRIC MACHINE GEARBOX AND ENGINE STARTER AND POWER GENERATOR INCLUDING GEARBOX | [2022/52] | French: | BOÎTE DE VITESSES DE MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE ET DÉMARREUR DE MOTEUR ET GÉNÉRATEUR D'ÉNERGIE COMPRENANT UNE BOÎTE DE VITESSES | [2022/52] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 24.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]DE448449 (RENAULT LOUIS) [X] 1,4,8,10 * page 1, line 1 - line 9 * * page 2, line 69 - line 97 * * figures 1,3 * [A] 3,15,16 [I] 2,5-7,9,11-14,17,18; | [A]EP1882115 (MAGNA POWERTRAIN AG & CO KG [AT]) [A] 1-18* paragraphs [0019] , [0 21]; figure 1 *; | [XAI]WO2018109515 (VOLVO TRUCK CORP [SE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-12 * figures 2a-2c,6a-6c * * page 12, lines 19, 21 * * page 11, line 18 - line 20 * [A] 15,16 [I] 3,7,13,14,17,18 | International search | [A]US2008045367 (GREB PETER [DE], et al) [A] 1-18 * entire document *; | [A]US2011263379 (LIANG WEI [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * entire document *; | [A]US2013281254 (DILZER MARTIN [DE], et al) [A] 1-18 * entire document *; | [A]US2017248196 (TURNER CHRISTOPHER D [US], et al) [A] 1-18* entire document * |