EP3919319 - BATTERY CHARGING CONTROL METHOD AND DEVICE, AND BATTERY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited No. 2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City Fujian 352100 / CN | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DU, Mingshu No. 2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | 02 /
LI, Shichao No. 2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | 03 /
WU, Weiqing No. 2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Wei No. 2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | [2023/34] |
Former [2021/49] | 01 /
DU, Mingshu Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | ||
02 /
LI, Shichao Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | |||
03 /
WU, Weiqing Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | |||
04 /
ZHANG, Wei Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 20920763.8 | 30.11.2020 | [2021/49] | WO2020CN132901 | Priority number, date | CN202010328925 | 23.04.2020 Original published format: CN202010328925 | [2021/49] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021212837 | Date: | 28.10.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3919319 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3919319 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60L58/16, B60L58/12, B60L3/12 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
H01M10/425 (EP,KR);
B60L53/62 (EP,KR,US);
B60L58/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H02J7/007182 (EP,KR,US);
B60L3/12 (EP,KR);
B60L53/66 (EP,KR);
B60L58/15 (CN);
B60L58/16 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M10/44 (EP,KR);
H01M10/443 (EP,KR);
H01M10/48 (EP,KR);
H01M10/486 (EP,KR);
H02J7/0048 (EP,US);
H02J7/005 (EP,US);
H02J7/00712 (EP,KR);
H02J7/007188 (EP,KR);
H02J7/007194 (EP,KR);
B60L2240/545 (EP);
B60Y2200/91 (KR);
H01M2010/4271 (EP,KR);
H01M2220/20 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/49] | B60L58/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIELADESTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG, BATTERIEVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM UND MEDIUM | [2021/49] | English: | BATTERY CHARGING CONTROL METHOD AND DEVICE, AND BATTERY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND MEDIUM | [2021/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE CHARGE DE BATTERIE ET SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE BATTERIE ET SUPPORT | [2021/49] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2021 | Translation filed | 01.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 27.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2023 | CZ | 23.08.2023 | DK | 23.08.2023 | EE | 23.08.2023 | FI | 23.08.2023 | HR | 23.08.2023 | LT | 23.08.2023 | LV | 23.08.2023 | MC | 23.08.2023 | PL | 23.08.2023 | RO | 23.08.2023 | RS | 23.08.2023 | SE | 23.08.2023 | SI | 23.08.2023 | SK | 23.08.2023 | SM | 23.08.2023 | GR | 24.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | LU | 30.11.2023 | IS | 23.12.2023 | PT | 26.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
MC | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
LU | 30.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
MC | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 23.08.2023 | |
GR | 24.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2015066406 (SUN JING [US], et al) [X] 1,11-13 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0045]; figure 10 *[A] 2-10 |