EP4098974 - NAVIGATION METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAN, Lei Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WU, Yong Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Jianqin Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
LI, Mingchao Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2022/49] | Application number, filing date | 20921045.9 | 28.02.2020 | [2022/49] | WO2020CN77195 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021168795 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4098974 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01S19/45, G01S19/05, G01S19/14, G01C21/30, G01S19/48, G01S19/03 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
G01S19/45 (EP,US);
G01C21/20 (CN);
G01C21/30 (EP,US);
G01C21/26 (CN);
G01S19/14 (EP);
G01S19/25 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/49] | G01C21/00, G01S19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Title | German: | NAVIGATIONSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG | [2022/49] | English: | NAVIGATION METHOD AND DEVICE | [2022/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE NAVIGATION | [2022/49] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2022 | Translation filed | 29.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | 26.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2011178708 (ZHANG GENGSHENG [US], et al); | [XI]DE102011051100 (UNIV KASSEL [DE]); | [XI]DE102014216276 (CONTI TEMIC MICROELECTRONIC [DE]); | [XA]US2019294898 (JIN JIN [US]) | International search | [A]US2008119212 (HIMMELSTEIN RICHARD B [US]) [A] 1-31 * entire document *; | [A]US2008188236 (ALLES MARTIN [US], et al) [A] 1-31* entire document *; | [A]CN110381526 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-31 * entire document *; | [X]CN110536234 (ZTE CORP) [X] 1-31 * description paragraphs 41-94 *; | [A]CN110632626 (QIDI COULD CONTROL BEIJING TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-31 * entire document * |