EP4112059 - MULTI-USE HEMOSTATIC COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 11.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Theracion Biomedical Co. Ltd. 807 25, Sagimakgol-ro 105beon-gil Jungwon-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13201 / KR | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Eun Jin 611-803 13, Bundang-ro 263beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13587 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Sun Jong 109-503 134, Geumsang-ro Jungwon-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13208 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Byung Nam 104 6-12, Bakseok-ro 5beon-gil Jungwon-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13228 / KR | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 20921268.7 | 27.02.2020 | [2023/01] | WO2020KR02840 | Priority number, date | KR20200022652 | 25.02.2020 Original published format: KR 20200022652 | [2023/01] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021172624 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4112059 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/715, A61K9/14, A61P7/04, A61L24/00, A61L24/04, A61P17/04 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61K31/715 (KR);
A61L24/043 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/717 (KR);
A61K31/718 (KR);
A61K9/16 (KR);
| C-Set: |
A61L24/043, C08L3/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/01] | A61K31/715, A61K9/14, A61P7/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Title | German: | HÄMOSTATISCHE MEHRFACH VERWENDBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2023/01] | English: | MULTI-USE HEMOSTATIC COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2023/01] | French: | COMPOSITION HÉMOSTATIQUE À USAGES MULTIPLES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2022 | Translation filed | 24.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 11.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP3199025 (JI XIN [CN]) [I] 1-17* page 39, preferred embodiment 1; page 42 , preferred embodiments 3, 4 * | International search | [A]JP2003531850 [A] 1-17* See entire document. *; | [A]JP2017538751 [A] 1-17 * See entire document. *; | [A]KR20180071681 (KIM EUN JIN [KR]) [A] 1-17 * See entire document. *; | [A]KR102073267B [A] 1-17 * See entire document. *; | [X]KR20200017731 (LEE YOUNG WOO [KR]) [X] 1-17 * See claims 1-22. * | by applicant | KR101301276B | KR20140074993 | KR20170060054 |