EP4087204 - COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAN, Mao Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
GAO, Kuandong Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
HUANG, Huang Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
LIN, Huajiong Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2022/45] | Application number, filing date | 20921922.9 | 30.12.2020 | [2022/45] | WO2020CN141645 | Priority number, date | CN202010124344 | 27.02.2020 Original published format: CN202010124344 | [2022/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021169586 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4087204 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04B5/00, H04L27/26, H04L5/00 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
H04L5/0048 (EP);
H04L27/2666 (CN);
G01N23/203 (US);
H04B5/77 (EP);
H04L1/0006 (CN);
H04L27/144 (US);
H04L27/2602 (CN);
H04L27/26025 (EP);
H04L27/2613 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/45] | H04L27/26, H04L1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2022/45] | English: | COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2022/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION | [2022/45] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2022 | Translation filed | 02.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 02.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 11.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - NGUYEN VAN HUYNH ET AL, "Ambient Backscatter Communications: A Contemporary Survey", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20171213), XP080843414 [X] 1-3,5-8,10-15 * page 21, column r * [I] 4,9 | [I] - MI NANHUAN ET AL, "CBMA: Coded-Backscatter Multiple Access", 2019 IEEE 39TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING SYSTEMS (ICDCS), IEEE, (20190707), doi:10.1109/ICDCS.2019.00084, pages 799 - 809, XP033651856 [I] 1-15 * section III.A; page 801 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDCS.2019.00084 | [A] - RENJIE ZHAO ET AL, "OFDMA-Enabled Wi-Fi Backscatter", MOBILE COMPUTING AND NETWORKING, ACM, 2 PENN PLAZA, SUITE 701NEW YORKNY10121-0701USA, (20190805), doi:10.1145/3300061.3300121, ISBN 978-1-4503-6169-9, pages 1 - 15, XP058475433 [A] 1-15 * section 2.2 * * figures 3, 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/3300061.3300121 |