EP4115191 - METHOD FOR TESTING A STANDARD INTERFACE AND INTERFACE-TESTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states China Triumph International Engineering Co., Ltd. 27F, No. 2000, Zhongqi Building North Zhongshan Road Putuo District Shanghai 200063 / CN | For all designated states CTF Solar GmbH Zur Wetterwarte 50 Haus 303 01109 Dresden / DE | [2023/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PENG, Shou 27F, No.2000, Zhongqi Building, North Zhongshan Road, Putuo District Shanghai 200063 / CN | 02 /
YIN, Xinjian 28F, No.2000, Zhongqi Building, North Zhongshan Road, Putuo District Shanghai 20063 / CN | 03 /
FU, Ganhua Frickestrasse 2 04105 Leipzig / DE | 04 /
LIAO, Zhizhong Dornichtweg 137 01109 Dresden / DE | 05 /
MISCHKE, Marcel Bautzner Str. 133 01099 Dresden / DE | 06 /
HARR, Michael Im Kleinen Grund 65779 Kelkheim-Ruppertshain / DE | 07 /
SIEPCHEN, Bastian Angelikastrabe 19 01099 Dresden / DE | [2023/02] | Representative(s) | Kailuweit & Uhlemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bamberger Straße 49 01187 Dresden / DE | [2023/02] | Application number, filing date | 20922842.8 | 04.03.2020 | [2023/02] | WO2020CN77694 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021174433 | Date: | 10.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4115191 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/40 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
H02S50/10 (EP);
H01L21/67276 (US);
G05B19/41875 (US);
H01L31/188 (US);
G05B2219/32368 (US);
Y02E10/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM TESTEN EINER STANDARDSCHNITTSTELLE UND SCHNITTSTELLENTESTER | [2023/02] | English: | METHOD FOR TESTING A STANDARD INTERFACE AND INTERFACE-TESTER | [2023/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TEST D'UNE INTERFACE STANDARD ET TESTEUR D'INTERFACE | [2023/02] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/02] | 30.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2016091838 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [X] 1,9,10 * page 8, line 15 - page 20, line 29; figures 1-3; claims 1-7 *[I] 2-8 | International search | [A]CN202494702U (SHENZHEN SUOYANG NEW ENERGY CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * See the whole document *; | [A]CN103235270 (BEIJING INST SPACECRAFT SYSTEM ENGINEERING) [A] 1-10 * See the whole document *; | [A]KR20150045871 (AT SOLUTION INC et al.) [A] 1-10* See the whole document * |