EP4020622 - ELECTROCHEMICAL DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 04.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ningde Amperex Technology Limited No.1 Xingang Road Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde City Fujian 352100 / CN | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Kefei NO.1 XINGANG ROAD, ZHANGWAN TOWN, JIAOCHENG DISTRICT Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 20923489.7 | 03.03.2020 | [2022/26] | WO2020CN77578 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021174410 | Date: | 10.09.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4020622 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/131 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
H01M4/661 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/131 (KR);
H01M4/364 (KR,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,KR);
H01M10/0567 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0569 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/366 (US);
H01M4/62 (EP,KR);
H01M4/663 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Title | German: | ELEKTROCHEMISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/26] | English: | ELECTROCHEMICAL DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2022/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2022/26] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2022 | Translation filed | 25.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 04.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2004281234 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0011] ** claims 1-10 * | International search | [Y]CN101364645 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 8, 19 * description paragraphs [0019]-[0025] *; | [Y]CN201985201U (HARBIN COSLIGHT POWER CO LTD) [Y] 1-19 * description paragraphs [0003]-[0005] *; | [Y]CN108315606 (JIANGSU ALCHA ALUMINUM CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1-19 * description paragraph [0013] *; | [Y]CN109309226 (NINGDE CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-19 * description paragraphs [0009], [0018]-[0022], [0024]-[0027] *; | [Y]CN109792085 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD) [Y] 13-19* description paragraphs [0029]-[0160] * |