EP3942949 - SMOKING APPARATUS FOR ENHANCING HEAT EXCHANGE EFFECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states China Tobacco Yunnan Industrial Co., Ltd No. 367 Hongjin Road Wuhua District Kunming, Yunnan 650231 / CN | [2023/15] |
Former [2022/04] | For all designated states China Tobacco Yunnan Industrial Co., Ltd No.367 Hongjin Road Wuhua District Kunming, Yunnan 650231 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Jun No.367, Hongjin Road, Wuhua District Kunming, Yunnan 650231 / CN | 02 /
LI, Shoubo No.367, Hongjin Road, Wuhua District Kunming, Yunnan 650231 / CN | 03 /
LI, Tinghua No.367, Hongjin Road, Wuhua District Kunming, Yunnan 650231 / CN | 04 /
ZHU, Donglai No.367, Hongjin Road, Wuhua District Kunming, Yunnan 650231 / CN | 05 /
GONG, Xiaowei No.367, Hongjin Road, Wuhua District Kunming, Yunnan 650231 / CN | 06 /
ZHANG, Xia No.367, Hongjin Road, Wuhua District Kunming, Yunnan 650231 / CN | 07 /
HAN, Yi No.367, Hongjin Road, Wuhua District Kunming, Yunnan 650231 / CN | 08 /
ZHAO, Wei No.367, Hongjin Road, Wuhua District Kunming, Yunnan 650231 / CN | 09 /
HONG, Liu No.367, Hongjin Road, Wuhua District Kunming, Yunnan 650231 / CN | [2023/15] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
WU, Jun Kunming, Yunnan 650231 / CN | ||
02 /
LI, Shoubo Kunming, Yunnan 650231 / CN | |||
03 /
LI, Tinghua Kunming, Yunnan 650231 / CN | |||
04 /
ZHU, Donglai Kunming, Yunnan 650231 / CN | |||
05 /
GONG, Xiaowei Kunming, Yunnan 650231 / CN | |||
06 /
ZHANG, Xia Kunming, Yunnan 650231 / CN | |||
07 /
HAN, Yi Kunming, Yunnan 650231 / CN | |||
08 /
ZHAO, Wei Kunming, Yunnan 650231 / CN | |||
09 /
HONG, Liu Kunming, Yunnan 650231 / CN | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 20927028.9 | 29.09.2020 | [2022/04] | WO2020CN118752 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021189801 | Date: | 30.09.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3942949 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3942949 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/48, // A24F40/20 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
A24F40/485 (EP);
A24F40/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/04] | A24F40/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RAUCHVORRICHTUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES WÄRMEAUSTAUSCHEFFEKTES | [2022/04] | English: | SMOKING APPARATUS FOR ENHANCING HEAT EXCHANGE EFFECT | [2022/04] | French: | APPAREIL À FUMER PERMETTANT D'AMÉLIORER L'EFFET D'ÉCHANGE DE CHALEUR | [2022/04] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2021 | Translation filed | 22.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 16.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.04.2023 | AT | 12.04.2023 | DK | 12.04.2023 | EE | 12.04.2023 | ES | 12.04.2023 | FI | 12.04.2023 | HR | 12.04.2023 | LT | 12.04.2023 | LV | 12.04.2023 | MC | 12.04.2023 | NL | 12.04.2023 | PL | 12.04.2023 | RO | 12.04.2023 | RS | 12.04.2023 | SE | 12.04.2023 | SI | 12.04.2023 | SK | 12.04.2023 | SM | 12.04.2023 | NO | 12.07.2023 | GR | 13.07.2023 | IS | 12.08.2023 | PT | 14.08.2023 | IE | 29.09.2023 | LU | 29.09.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | FR | 30.09.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
IE | 29.09.2023 | ||
LU | 29.09.2023 | ||
CH | 30.09.2023 | ||
FR | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
IE | 29.09.2023 | ||
LU | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
LU | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
LU | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 12.04.2023 | |
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 12.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN206923683U (CHINA TOBACCO HUNAN IND CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0054] *; | [A]US2019191769 (QIU WEIHUA [CN]) [A] 1-10 * abstract ** paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0066] *; | [A]US2019261688 (QIU WEIHUA [CN], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0062] *; | [A]CN111436662 (CHINA TOBACCO YUNNAN IND CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0086] *; | [A]CN111449302 (SHENZHEN CHANGNENG HUIKE TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0060] * |