EP4129460 - IMMERSED MICRO-INTERFACE ENHANCED REACTION SYSTEM AND PROCESS FOR PROPYLENE HYDRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanjing Yanchang Reaction Technology Research Institute Co., Ltd Zhou Zheng No. 88, South Tank Farm Road Jiangbei New District Nanjing, Jiangsu 210047 / CN | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Zhibing ZHOU, Zheng No. 88, South Tank Farm Road, Jiangbei New District Nanjing, Jiangsu 210047 / CN | 02 /
ZHOU, Zheng No. 88, South Tank Farm Road, Jiangbei New District Nanjing, Jiangsu 210047 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Feng ZHOU, Zheng No. 88, South Tank Farm Road, Jiangbei New District Nanjing, Jiangsu 210047 / CN | 04 /
LI, Lei ZHOU, Zheng No. 88, South Tank Farm Road, Jiangbei New District Nanjing, Jiangsu 210047 / CN | 05 /
MENG, Weimin ZHOU, Zheng No. 88, South Tank Farm Road, Jiangbei New District Nanjing, Jiangsu 210047 / CN | 06 /
WANG, Baorong ZHOU, Zheng No. 88, South Tank Farm Road, Jiangbei New District Nanjing, Jiangsu 210047 / CN | 07 /
YANG, Gaodong ZHOU, Zheng No. 88, South Tank Farm Road, Jiangbei New District Nanjing, Jiangsu 210047 / CN | 08 /
LUO, Huaxun ZHOU, Zheng No. 88, South Tank Farm Road, Jiangbei New District Nanjing, Jiangsu 210047 / CN | 09 /
YANG, Guoqiang ZHOU, Zheng No. 88, South Tank Farm Road, Jiangbei New District Nanjing, Jiangsu 210047 / CN | 10 /
TIAN, Hongzhou ZHOU, Zheng No. 88, South Tank Farm Road, Jiangbei New District Nanjing, Jiangsu 210047 / CN | 11 /
CAO, Yu ZHOU, Zheng No. 88, South Tank Farm Road, Jiangbei New District Nanjing, Jiangsu 210047 / CN | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Zaboliene, Reda Metida Business center Vertas Gyneju str. 16 01109 Vilnius / LT | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 20927210.3 | 28.05.2020 | [2023/06] | WO2020CN92755 | Priority number, date | CN202010217611 | 25.03.2020 Original published format: CN202010217611 | [2023/06] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021189638 | Date: | 30.09.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4129460 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/02, C07C31/10, C07C29/04, C07C29/80, C10J3/72, C10J3/46, C10J3/48, C10G2/00, B01D5/00, B01J8/22, B01J19/24, B01J8/00 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
C07C29/04 (EP);
B01J8/008 (EP,CN,US);
B01J8/0257 (US);
B01J19/2465 (EP);
B01J8/0214 (EP);
B01J8/0242 (CN);
B01J8/0285 (EP,US);
C07C29/48 (US);
B01J2204/002 (EP);
B01J2208/00176 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00823 (EP);
B01J2208/0084 (EP);
B01J2208/00849 (EP);
B01J2208/00893 (EP);
B01J2208/00938 (EP);
Y02P20/52 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/04, C07C31/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/06] | B01J8/02, C07C31/10, C07C29/04, C07C29/80, C10J3/72, C10J3/46, C10J3/48, C10G2/00, B01D5/00, B01J8/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES REAKTIONSSYSTEM MIT IMMERSIVER MIKROSCHNITTSTELLE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HYDRATISIERUNG VON PROPYLEN | [2023/06] | English: | IMMERSED MICRO-INTERFACE ENHANCED REACTION SYSTEM AND PROCESS FOR PROPYLENE HYDRATION | [2023/06] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RÉACTION AMÉLIORÉ À MICRO-INTERFACE IMMERGÉE ET PROCÉDÉ D'HYDRATATION DE PROPYLÈNE | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2022 | Translation filed | 07.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 20.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2009005613 (HASSAN ABBAS [US], et al) [I] 1-7* paragraphs [0012] , [0 13] , [0 46] , [0 55] - [0058]; figure 1; claim - * | International search | [A]CN202379909U (CHINA NAT PETROLEUM CORP) [A] 1-9* entire document *; | [Y]CN107417497 (JIANGSU XINHUA CHEMICAL CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1-9 * description, paragraphs [0017]-[0019] and figures 1, 2 *; | [Y]CN110591763 (NANJING YANCHANG REACTION TECH RESEARCH INSTITUTE CO LTD) [Y] 1-9 * description, paragraphs [0058]-[0070] and figure 1 * |